Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2739796

EP2739796 - A METHOD OF ASSEMBLING A WALL FROM PREFABRICATED WALL PARTS AND A WALL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mecal B.V.
Capitool 15
7521 PL Enschede / NL
[2014/40]
Former [2014/24]For all designated states
Mecal B.V.
Capitool 64
7521 PL Enschede / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BRUGHUIS, Franciscus Johannes
c/o Mecal B.V.
Capitool 64
NL-7521 PL Enschede / NL
 [2014/24]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2017/18]
Former [2014/24]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12750864.606.08.2012
[2017/18]
WO2012NL50549
Priority number, dateNL2011200723105.08.2011         Original published format: NL 2007231
[2014/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013022341
Date:14.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2739796
Date:11.06.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013
[2014/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2739796
Date:03.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:E04B1/04, E04H12/12, E04B1/68
[2014/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINER WAND AUS VORGEFERTIGTEN WANDTEILE UND EINE WANDMONTAGE[2016/52]
English:A METHOD OF ASSEMBLING A WALL FROM PREFABRICATED WALL PARTS AND A WALL ASSEMBLY[2014/24]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UNE PAROI DE PARTIES PRÉFABRIQUÉES ET UN ASSEMBLAGE DE PAROI.[2016/52]
Former [2014/24]VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINER WAND AUS FERTIGWANDTEILEN UND WANDANORDNUNG
Former [2014/24]PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UNE PAROI À PARTIR DE PARTIES DE PAROI PRÉFABRIQUÉES ET ENSEMBLE DE PAROI
Entry into regional phase03.03.2014National basic fee paid 
03.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.05.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/24]
13.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2017Fee for grant paid
15.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.03.2016
Opposition(s)06.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.08.2012
AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
GB06.08.2017
IE06.08.2017
LU06.08.2017
MT06.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
GB06.08.2017
IE06.08.2017
LU06.08.2017
MT06.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/37]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
GB06.08.2017
IE06.08.2017
LU06.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/35]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
GB06.08.2017
IE06.08.2017
LU06.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/34]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IE06.08.2017
LU06.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/25]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/21]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/18]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2017/52]AT03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[XI]DE8809399U  (ZAPF) [X] 1-3,6-10,12-14 * page 12, paragraph 1 - page 16, paragraph 4 * * page 17, paragraph 2 - page 17, paragraph 4; figure 3 * [I] 4,11;
 [XI]FR2610023  (HUONDER ENG AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,5-9 * the whole document * [I] 4,14;
 [XI]DE202009011357U  (PFEIFER HOLDING GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-8 * figures 1-8c; claims 1-3 * [I] 4,14;
 [A]WO0151740  (ABETONG TEKNIK AB [SE]; KUMLIN ULF [SE]) [A] 1,6,14 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]AT507263  (MONTAGEBAU BREU [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *
by applicantWO2008110309
 WO03069099