Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2751282

EP2751282 - DETECTION OF PRAME GENE EXPRESSION IN CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.06.2016
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.07.2016  [2016/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
Rue de l'Institut, 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/28]For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
rue de l'Institut, 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
Inventor(s)01 / MINGUET, Catherine
Glaxo Smith Kline Biologicals S.A.
89 rue de l'Institut
B-1330 Rixensart / BE
 [2014/28]
Representative(s)O'Farrell, Damien John
GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[2014/28]
Application number, filing date12751532.830.08.2012
WO2012EP66920
Priority number, dateGB2011001491930.08.2011         Original published format: GB 201114919
[2014/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013030310
Date:07.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2751282
Date:09.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013
[2014/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, C07K14/47, C07K16/30
[2014/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/28]
Extension statesBA20.01.2014
ME20.01.2014
TitleGerman:NACHWEIS VON PRAME-GENEXPRESSION BEI KREBS[2014/28]
English:DETECTION OF PRAME GENE EXPRESSION IN CANCER[2014/28]
French:DÉTECTION DE L'EXPRESSION DU GÈNE PRAME DANS UN CANCER[2014/28]
Entry into regional phase20.01.2014National basic fee paid 
20.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/28]
31.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/28]
09.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/28]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.07.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2008147205  (AGENDIA B V [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-10,12 * SEQ ID NO:146 comprises SEQ ID NO:6;; table 3 * [Y] 3,5,6;
 [XY]WO03078662  (GENOMIC HEALTH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-12 * SEQ ID NO:34 is the PRAME gene sequence and comprises SEQ ID NO:7.; page 56 - page 62; example 3 * [Y] 3,5,6;
 [I]WO2011062634  (MANNKIND CORP [US], et al) [I] 13-19 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035]; example 5 *;
 [I]WO2008087102  (GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOG SA [BE], et al) [I] 13-19 * the whole document *;
 [I]WO02081646  (CTL IMMUNOTHERAPIES CORP [US]) [I] 13-19 * tables 55,56 *;
 [I]WO2004112825  (MANNKIND CORP [US], et al) [I] 13-19 * claim 1 *;
 [YA]WO2004074518  (GENOMIC HEALTH INC [US], et al) [Y] 3,5,6 * page 27, line 28 - page 33, line 21; examples 1,2 * [A] 12
 [X]  - CARNINCI P ET AL, "NORMALIZATION AND SUBTRACTION OF CAP-TRAPPER-SELECTED CDNAS TO PREPARE FULL-LENGTH CDNA LIBRARIES FOR RAPID DISCOVERY OF NEW GENES", GENOME RESEARCH, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, WOODBURY, NY, US, (20000101), vol. 10, no. 10, doi:10.1101/GR.145100, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 1617 - 1630, XP002944079 [X] 1,2,4 * Accession number HY028994 which is 480 bp in length comprises SEQ I D NO:5 fom bp 4 to 20. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.145100
by applicantWO9118926
 WO9602555
 WO9400153
 WO9633739
 WO9517210
    - IKEDA ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1997), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 199 - 208,
    - PAYDAS ET AL., LEUKEMIA RESEARCH, (2007), vol. 31, pages 365 - 369,
    - PROTO-SIQUEIRA ET AL., LEUKEMIA RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 27, pages 393 - 396,
    - GRAVITT ET AL., JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 36, no. 10, pages 3020 - 3027,
    - KLETER ET AL., JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 37, no. 8, pages 2508 - 2517,
    - MANIATIS ET AL., Molecular Cloning - A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR,