blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2764685 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2764685



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 412
13.12.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 1
13.09.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
10.09.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
04.09.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
03.09.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
03.09.2018 Decision to refuse according to the state of the file Search / examination 2
03.09.2018 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
03.09.2018 Means of redress Search / examination 2
06.08.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.06.2018 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.02.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
01.02.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
01.02.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
01.02.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
01.02.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
14.09.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
14.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.09.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
15.05.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
15.05.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.05.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
02.01.2017 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
15.10.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
01.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
01.12.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
01.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
01.12.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 41
01.12.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 41
01.12.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
01.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.07.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.05.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
12.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.04.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
07.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.04.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
14.02.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.05.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 90
03.05.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 74
11.04.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
11.04.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 60
15.10.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
15.10.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
15.10.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3