blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2764685


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.12.2018 Refusal of application published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
05.09.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
02.09.2018 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
01.08.2018 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
31.01.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
15.09.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.07.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.05.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.05.2017 First examination report
05.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.07.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.12.2014 Change - extension states published on  14.01.2015  [2015/03]
02.12.2014 Amendment by applicant
31.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.07.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.08.2014  [2014/33]
11.07.2014 Request for examination filed published on  13.08.2014  [2014/33]
07.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
12.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication