blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2764685 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201080018803 CN201080034417 CN201180000582 CN201280001807 CN201280037710 CN201280037714 CN201280037716 CN201280038760 CN201280038849 CN201280054228

More

CN201280060176 CN201380028298 CN201380038189 CN201380047256 CN201380059705 CN201380059706 CN201380072541 CN201380072876 CN201380072878 CN201380073551 CN201380073584 CN201380074083 CN201380074174 CN201410525794 CN201410721248 CN201480076762 CN201510182418 CN201811582716 EP10707740 EP10728039 EP11163417 EP12189618 EP12189621 EP12727207 EP12727208 EP12727764 EP12737632 EP12743806 EP12751646 EP12780954 EP12878368 EP13715175 EP13717653 EP13739655 EP13766872 EP13767228 EP13770520 EP13802828 EP13814375 EP13821359 EP13821422 EP13824070



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2015103448Global Dossier 03.09.2015A3
WO2015103448 09.07.2015A2
Priority number Date
WO2013US78551 31.12.2013
US201414299987 09.06.2014
US201414246006 04.04.2014
US201414281883 19.05.2014
WO2014US59200 03.10.2014
US201461923742 05.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2015103446Global Dossier 27.08.2015A3
WO2015103446 09.07.2015A2
Priority number Date
WO2013US78551 31.12.2013
US201461923732 05.01.2014
US201414299987 09.06.2014
US201414246006 04.04.2014
US201414281883 19.05.2014
WO2014US59200 03.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2015051344Global Dossier 09.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201361886516 03.10.2013
US201414299987 09.06.2014
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201414506377 03.10.2014
US201314137573 20.12.2013
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014143338Global Dossier 29.01.2015A3
WO2014143338 18.09.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201261745193 21.12.2012
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014106278Global Dossier 03.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314029716 17.09.2013
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201261747844 31.12.2012
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201314029683 17.09.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014106276Global Dossier 09.10.2014A3
WO2014106276 03.07.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201261747789 31.12.2012
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201313966052 13.08.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014106210Global Dossier 03.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261747947 31.12.2012
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014105993Global Dossier 03.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
WO2013US35149 03.04.2013
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201361882546 25.09.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201313839118 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014105904Global Dossier 03.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US201261748024 31.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014105897Global Dossier 03.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201261748012 31.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014105241Global Dossier 03.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201361880827 20.09.2013
US201313901428 23.05.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014100787Global Dossier 26.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314029716 17.09.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201314029683 17.09.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201261745489 21.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014100786Global Dossier 26.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201314029683 17.09.2013
US201261747736 31.12.2012
US201261745489 21.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314029716 17.09.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014100784Global Dossier 26.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314029716 17.09.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201314029683 17.09.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201261745489 21.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014100783Global Dossier 26.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314029716 17.09.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201314029683 17.09.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201261745489 21.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014100741Global Dossier 04.09.2014A3
WO2014100741 26.06.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201261745440 21.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014100507Global Dossier 18.09.2014A3
WO2014100507 26.06.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201261745373 21.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014093724Global Dossier 19.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261737660 14.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014093721Global Dossier 07.08.2014A3
WO2014093721 19.06.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201361793181 15.03.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261737678 14.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014085699Global Dossier 05.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261730435 27.11.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014082097Global Dossier 30.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201361790189 15.03.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261730031 26.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014047076Global Dossier 27.03.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201261745489 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014047075Global Dossier 27.03.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201261745489 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014043592Global Dossier 31.07.2014A3
WO2014043592 20.03.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201261701292 14.09.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014028540Global Dossier 25.09.2014A9
WO2014028540 20.02.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261683124 14.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014012946Global Dossier 23.01.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261672153 16.07.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014012070Global Dossier 16.01.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201261670824 12.07.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013184220Global Dossier 21.08.2014A3
WO2013184220 12.12.2013A2
Priority number Date
US201261656889 07.06.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201313802615 13.03.2013
US201261612794 19.03.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013184152Global Dossier 12.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US41774 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013152122Global Dossier 21.08.2014A3
WO2013152122 10.10.2013A2
Priority number Date
US201261621385 06.04.2012
US201313839118 15.03.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013144298Global Dossier 03.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261618001 30.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013052383Global Dossier 11.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261663336 22.06.2012
US201161545056 07.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2012170954Global Dossier 03.04.2014A3
WO2012170954 14.02.2013A9
WO2012170954 13.12.2012A2
Priority number Date
US201261646750 14.05.2012
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201261646732 14.05.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2012170953Global Dossier 12.09.2013A3
WO2012170953 13.12.2012A2
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201261656841 07.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2012170949Global Dossier 11.04.2013A3
WO2012170949 13.12.2012A2
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2012170946Global Dossier 23.05.2013A3
WO2012170946 04.04.2013A9
WO2012170946 13.12.2012A2
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2012170941Global Dossier 13.12.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2011131758Global Dossier 27.10.2011A1
Priority number Date
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US76673910 23.04.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2011112633Global Dossier 15.09.2011A1
Priority number Date
US31214610 09.03.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2010141772Global Dossier 09.12.2010A1
Priority number Date
US47782809 03.06.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2010101786Global Dossier 10.09.2010A1
Priority number Date
US39634009 02.03.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019141261Global Dossier 09.05.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201816147381 28.09.2018
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201261745193 21.12.2012
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201314137573 20.12.2013
US31214610 09.03.2010
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201113043123 08.03.2011
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018205893Global Dossier 19.07.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201261737660 14.12.2012
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201815919116 12.03.2018
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US201314106696 13.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017374261Global Dossier 28.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201261663336 22.06.2012
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US58099 28.09.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201715614458 05.06.2017
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201414246006 04.04.2014
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016316154Global Dossier 27.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201261683124 14.08.2012
US201414299987 09.06.2014
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201229423027 25.05.2012
US201213529772 21.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201461923732 05.01.2014
US201261652075 25.05.2012
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201414281883 19.05.2014
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US39634009 02.03.2009
US201615199867 30.06.2016
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201261747789 31.12.2012
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201361880827 20.09.2013
US201313901428 23.05.2013
US201261745489 21.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2014US73096 31.12.2014
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201314029716 17.09.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201414246006 04.04.2014
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201313966052 13.08.2013
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016316119Global Dossier 27.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201261683124 14.08.2012
US201414299987 09.06.2014
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201229423027 25.05.2012
US201213529772 21.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201261652075 25.05.2012
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201414281883 19.05.2014
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US39634009 02.03.2009
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201261747789 31.12.2012
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201615199861 30.06.2016
US201361880827 20.09.2013
US201313901428 23.05.2013
WO2014US73098 31.12.2014
US201261745489 21.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201314029716 17.09.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201414246006 04.04.2014
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201313966052 13.08.2013
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US201461923742 05.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016156880Global Dossier 02.06.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201414299987 09.06.2014
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201261745193 21.12.2012
US201313940232 11.07.2013
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201314137573 20.12.2013
US31214610 09.03.2010
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201113043123 08.03.2011
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201261670824 12.07.2012
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361886516 03.10.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201414506377 03.10.2014
US201261656889 07.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015319378Global Dossier 05.11.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013US78551 31.12.2013
US201514747865 23.06.2015
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201261747789 31.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015296146Global Dossier 15.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261746074 26.12.2012
WO2013US77887 26.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201313839118 15.03.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
WO2013US35149 03.04.2013
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201361882546 25.09.2013
US201514748542 24.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014319677Global Dossier 30.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US41774 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014112537Global Dossier 24.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314101224 09.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201261656841 07.06.2012
WO2012US41755 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013314536Global Dossier 28.11.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201213529772 21.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201261652030 25.05.2012
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201313902177 24.05.2013
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US39634009 02.03.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013300875Global Dossier 14.11.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US201261672153 16.07.2012
US201313942624 15.07.2013
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US76673910 23.04.2010
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013278771Global Dossier 24.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201261645831 11.05.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201313892202 10.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013258111Global Dossier 03.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261652075 25.05.2012
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201313901428 23.05.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201213529772 21.06.2012
US201229423027 25.05.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US39634009 02.03.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013253551Global Dossier 26.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261595888 07.02.2012
US201313759377 05.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10321031Global Dossier 11.06.2019B2
US2018198960 12.07.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201361880827 20.09.2013
US201313901428 23.05.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201815932372 16.02.2018
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201229423027 25.05.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2013US62433 27.09.2013
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201261652075 25.05.2012
US201414281883 19.05.2014
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201514747202 23.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10250822Global Dossier 02.04.2019B2
US2017208260 20.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201313802615 13.03.2013
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201261612794 19.03.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201615362752 28.11.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10249032Global Dossier 02.04.2019B2
US2017004609 05.01.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201615267133 15.09.2016
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201514922076 23.10.2015
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US76673910 23.04.2010
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10244190Global Dossier 26.03.2019B2
US2015358560 10.12.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201213529772 21.06.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US39634009 02.03.2009
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201314029683 17.09.2013
US201261745489 21.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201314029716 17.09.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10232237Global Dossier 19.03.2019B2
US2016074724 17.03.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201414299987 09.06.2014
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201462050726 15.09.2014
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201514850667 10.09.2015
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201414506430 03.10.2014
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10230910Global Dossier 12.03.2019B2
US2017359526 14.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201715665277 31.07.2017
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10169666Global Dossier 01.01.2019B2
US2015379361 31.12.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201462050707 15.09.2014
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201514850558 10.09.2015
US201414506430 03.10.2014
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10122944Global Dossier 06.11.2018B2
US2017318237 02.11.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201715645949 10.07.2017
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10110833Global Dossier 23.10.2018B2
US2017374298 28.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201715645988 10.07.2017
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201361790189 15.03.2013
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US76673910 23.04.2010
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US201314091266 26.11.2013
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201261730031 26.11.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10091439Global Dossier 02.10.2018B2
US2014139643 22.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201261745193 21.12.2012
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201314137573 20.12.2013
US31214610 09.03.2010
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201113043123 08.03.2011
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10079982Global Dossier 18.09.2018B2
US2014232875 21.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201414245990 04.04.2014
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
WO2012US49051 31.07.2012
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201261616766 28.03.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10051210Global Dossier 14.08.2018B2
US2015319379 05.11.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201261748012 31.12.2012
WO2013US77681 24.12.2013
US201314138052 21.12.2013
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201514748873 24.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10044946Global Dossier 07.08.2018B2
US2015109454 23.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201414299987 09.06.2014
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201414503332 30.09.2014
US201261618001 30.03.2012
US201113105765 11.05.2011
WO2013EP56708 28.03.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10033944Global Dossier 24.07.2018B2
US2017078590 16.03.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201213529772 21.06.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US201615269905 19.09.2016
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US39634009 02.03.2009
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201314029683 17.09.2013
US201261745489 21.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201314029716 17.09.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9998697Global Dossier 12.06.2018B2
US2017088098 30.03.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201213529772 21.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201615375069 09.12.2016
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201261652030 25.05.2012
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201313902177 24.05.2013
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US39634009 02.03.2009
US201314097197 04.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9986175Global Dossier 29.05.2018B2
US2015288892 08.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201361880827 20.09.2013
US201313901428 23.05.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201229423027 25.05.2012
US201213529772 21.06.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2013US62433 27.09.2013
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201261652075 25.05.2012
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US39634009 02.03.2009
US201514747202 23.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9973692Global Dossier 15.05.2018B2
US2015172545 18.06.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201414506430 03.10.2014
US201361886543 03.10.2013
US201461928369 16.01.2014
US201514599352 16.01.2015
US201462059112 02.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9961277Global Dossier 01.05.2018B2
US2015312490 29.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
WO2012US41774 08.06.2012
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US201261748024 31.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
WO2013US77696 24.12.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201514751437 26.06.2015
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9948878Global Dossier 17.04.2018B2
US2016224055 04.08.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201314106666 13.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201361793181 15.03.2013
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201514961829 07.12.2015
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US201261737678 14.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9948872Global Dossier 17.04.2018B2
US2013321637 05.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261651976 25.05.2012
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201213529772 21.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US39634009 02.03.2009
US201313902115 24.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9918023Global Dossier 13.03.2018B2
US2014184807 03.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201261737660 14.12.2012
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US201314106696 13.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9900526Global Dossier 20.02.2018B2
US2015312488 29.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261747947 31.12.2012
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
WO2013US78369 30.12.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201514749886 25.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9900478Global Dossier 20.02.2018B2
US2014253735 11.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US84103607 20.08.2007
US201361880827 20.09.2013
US201313901428 23.05.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2013US62433 27.09.2013
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US91089404 04.08.2004
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US65485103 04.09.2003
US201414281883 19.05.2014
US91117704 04.08.2004
US18912205 25.07.2005
US3965305 19.01.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9848134Global Dossier 19.12.2017B2
US2014092256 03.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US76673910 23.04.2010
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201261730435 27.11.2012
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US201314092794 27.11.2013
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9843743Global Dossier 12.12.2017B2
US2013342691 26.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201261670824 12.07.2012
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201313940232 11.07.2013
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9843742Global Dossier 12.12.2017B2
US2013250125 26.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261646781 14.05.2012
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201313893809 14.05.2013
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201213529772 21.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US39634009 02.03.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9819880Global Dossier 14.11.2017B2
US2014168445 19.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201261745440 21.12.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US201314136557 20.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9807319Global Dossier 31.10.2017B2
US2015085133 26.03.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201414299987 09.06.2014
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201261745193 21.12.2012
US201313940232 11.07.2013
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US201361886543 03.10.2013
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201314137573 20.12.2013
US31214610 09.03.2010
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201113043123 08.03.2011
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201261670824 12.07.2012
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201414506430 03.10.2014
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9756264Global Dossier 05.09.2017B2
US2015312489 29.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201213529772 21.06.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US39634009 02.03.2009
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201261747844 31.12.2012
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201314029683 17.09.2013
US201261745489 21.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201314029716 17.09.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
WO2013US78554 31.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201514750781 25.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9756262Global Dossier 05.09.2017B2
US2014168433 19.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201314135493 19.12.2013
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201261745373 21.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9723228Global Dossier 01.08.2017B2
US2014098238 10.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9723227Global Dossier 01.08.2017B2
US2014092257 03.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9716844Global Dossier 25.07.2017B2
US2016366345 15.12.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314133095 18.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9716843Global Dossier 25.07.2017B2
US2014104415 17.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261595888 07.02.2012
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US76673910 23.04.2010
WO2013US59831 13.09.2013
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201314034493 23.09.2013
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US201261701292 14.09.2012
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9706139Global Dossier 11.07.2017B2
US2014139685 22.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9706138Global Dossier 11.07.2017B2
US2014085482 27.03.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201361790189 15.03.2013
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US76673910 23.04.2010
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US201314091266 26.11.2013
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201261730031 26.11.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9706137Global Dossier 11.07.2017B2
US2013250102 26.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261621385 06.04.2012
US201313839118 15.03.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9674458Global Dossier 06.06.2017B2
US2014218520 07.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201261663336 22.06.2012
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US58099 28.09.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US5643211 21.04.2011
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201414246006 04.04.2014
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9635285Global Dossier 25.04.2017B2
US2015334315 19.11.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201213529772 21.06.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US39634009 02.03.2009
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201314029683 17.09.2013
US201261745489 21.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201314029716 17.09.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9538038Global Dossier 03.01.2017B2
US2014098237 10.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314101220 09.12.2013
US201261646750 14.05.2012
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201261646732 14.05.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
WO2012US41756 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9521289Global Dossier 13.12.2016B2
US2014092258 03.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261646750 14.05.2012
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201314101209 09.12.2013
US201261646732 14.05.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
WO2012US41756 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9517679Global Dossier 13.12.2016B2
US2014093133 03.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201213529772 21.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201261652030 25.05.2012
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201113902177 24.05.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US39634009 02.03.2009
US201314097197 04.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9509924Global Dossier 29.11.2016B2
US2013242110 19.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201313802615 13.03.2013
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201261612794 19.03.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9473681Global Dossier 18.10.2016B2
US2013329054 12.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261683124 14.08.2012
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201313966052 13.08.2013
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9471970Global Dossier 18.10.2016B2
US2016042503 11.02.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201514922076 23.10.2015
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US76673910 23.04.2010
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9451183Global Dossier 20.09.2016B2
US2014240512 28.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201213529772 21.06.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US39634009 02.03.2009
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201314029683 17.09.2013
US201261745489 21.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201314029716 17.09.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9292909Global Dossier 22.03.2016B2
US2015332441 19.11.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201261747736 31.12.2012
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201314138055 21.12.2013
US201261746069 26.12.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US47782809 03.06.2009
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201314029683 17.09.2013
US201261745489 21.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201314029716 17.09.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9247131Global Dossier 26.01.2016B2
US2015365592 17.12.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201313802578 13.03.2013
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201261612131 16.03.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201514736133 10.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9237284Global Dossier 12.01.2016B2
US2013022279 24.01.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201213529772 21.06.2012
US39634009 02.03.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9235876Global Dossier 12.01.2016B2
US2014037225 06.02.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201261745489 21.12.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201213529772 21.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201314029716 17.09.2013
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US39634009 02.03.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9235023Global Dossier 12.01.2016B2
US2013270441 17.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201313802495 13.03.2013
US201261612109 16.03.2012
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9208542Global Dossier 08.12.2015B2
US2014016879 16.01.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201314029683 17.09.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201261745489 21.12.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201213529772 21.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US39634009 02.03.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9207708Global Dossier 08.12.2015B2
US2014108850 17.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201361793181 15.03.2013
US201314106666 13.12.2013
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201161495873 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
US76673910 23.04.2010
US201361792582 15.03.2013
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US201261737678 14.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9171361Global Dossier 27.10.2015B2
US2014015982 16.01.2014A9
US2012262584 18.10.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201213437645 02.04.2012
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US76673910 23.04.2010
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9143703Global Dossier 22.09.2015B2
US2012312976 13.12.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201213491428 07.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9083897Global Dossier 14.07.2015B2
US2014285672 25.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201414299987 09.06.2014
US47782809 03.06.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9058653Global Dossier 16.06.2015B1
US2015146009 28.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201313802578 13.03.2013
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201261612131 16.03.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8780208Global Dossier 15.07.2014B2
US2012321212 20.12.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201213529772 21.06.2012
US39634009 02.03.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8766808Global Dossier 01.07.2014B2
US2011221599 15.09.2011A1
Priority number Date
US31214610 09.03.2010
US201113043123 08.03.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8749635Global Dossier 10.06.2014B2
US2010309315 09.12.2010A1
Priority number Date
US47782809 03.06.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8727608Global Dossier 20.05.2014B2
US2008259993 23.10.2008A1
Priority number Date
US84103607 20.08.2007
US91117704 04.08.2004
US91089404 04.08.2004
US3965305 19.01.2005
US18912205 25.07.2005
US65485103 04.09.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8565547Global Dossier 22.10.2013B2
US2011261207 27.10.2011A1
Priority number Date
US201113105765 11.05.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US76673910 23.04.2010
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8520970Global Dossier 27.08.2013B2
US2011262053 27.10.2011A1
Priority number Date
US76673910 23.04.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8208026Global Dossier 26.06.2012B2
US2010220193 02.09.2010A1
Priority number Date
US39634009 02.03.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7452127Global Dossier 18.11.2008B2
US2007019705 25.01.2007A1
Priority number Date
US18912205 25.07.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7192186Global Dossier 20.03.2007B2
US2006227846 12.10.2006A1
Priority number Date
US41590902 03.10.2002
US42154306 01.06.2006
US65485103 04.09.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7168316Global Dossier 30.01.2007B2
US2005178199 18.08.2005A1
Priority number Date
US53755704 20.01.2004
US3965305 19.01.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7163336Global Dossier 16.01.2007B2
US2005031013 10.02.2005A1
Priority number Date
US49241403 04.08.2003
US91089404 04.08.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7111981Global Dossier 26.09.2006B2
US2005147152 07.07.2005A1
Priority number Date
US91117704 04.08.2004
US53447404 06.01.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7056012Global Dossier 06.06.2006B2
US2004066833 08.04.2004A1
Priority number Date
US41590902 03.10.2002
US65485103 04.09.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20160105513Global Dossier 06.09.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2013US78551 31.12.2013
US201461923732 05.01.2014
US201414299987 09.06.2014
US201414246006 04.04.2014
US201414281883 19.05.2014
WO2014US59200 03.10.2014
WO2014US73096 31.12.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20150020278Global Dossier 25.02.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2012US41774 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101831486BGlobal Dossier 22.02.2018B1
KR20140067160 03.06.2014A
Priority number Date
US201261663336 22.06.2012
US201161545056 07.10.2011
WO2012US58099 28.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101808375BGlobal Dossier 12.12.2017B1
KR20140035491 21.03.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101778353BGlobal Dossier 13.09.2017B1
KR20140041714 04.04.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101774091BGlobal Dossier 01.09.2017B1
KR20140041713 04.04.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101773887BGlobal Dossier 12.09.2017B1
KR20130054281 24.05.2013A
Priority number Date
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US76673910 23.04.2010
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101668544BGlobal Dossier 28.10.2016B1
KR20140134694 24.11.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013US31734 14.03.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201313802615 13.03.2013
US201261612794 19.03.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101610432BGlobal Dossier 07.04.2016B1
KR20120038431 23.04.2012A
Priority number Date
US47782809 03.06.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2015529965Global Dossier 08.10.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2012US41774 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2939414Global Dossier 02.08.2017B1
EP2939414 04.11.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
WO2013US35149 03.04.2013
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201361882546 25.09.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
WO2013US77887 26.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201313839118 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2939413Global Dossier 04.11.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261747947 31.12.2012
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
WO2013US78369 30.12.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2936799Global Dossier 17.10.2018B1
EP2936799 28.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201314029683 17.09.2013
US201261745489 21.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314029716 17.09.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
WO2013US77342 21.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2932529Global Dossier 21.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261737660 14.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2013US74831 12.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2923187Global Dossier 02.11.2016B1
EP2923187 30.09.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201361790189 15.03.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261730031 26.11.2012
WO2013US72105 26.11.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2898670Global Dossier 10.10.2018B1
EP2898670 29.07.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261745504 21.12.2012
WO2013US60210 17.09.2013
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201261745489 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2898669Global Dossier 29.07.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201261745489 21.12.2012
WO2013US60216 17.09.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2873229Global Dossier 20.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261672153 16.07.2012
WO2013EP65035 16.07.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2859583Global Dossier 20.07.2016A4
EP2859583 15.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US41774 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2834968Global Dossier 11.02.2015A2
Priority number Date
US201261621385 06.04.2012
US201313839118 15.03.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
WO2013US35149 03.04.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2831812Global Dossier 04.02.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261618001 30.03.2012
WO2013EP56708 28.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2829056Global Dossier 28.01.2015A2
Priority number Date
WO2013US31734 14.03.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201313802615 13.03.2013
US201261612794 19.03.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2764686Global Dossier 13.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261663336 22.06.2012
US201161545056 07.10.2011
WO2012US58099 28.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2719168Global Dossier 16.04.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201261656841 07.06.2012
WO2012US41755 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2719167Global Dossier 08.08.2018B1
EP2719167 16.04.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2719166Global Dossier 28.03.2018B1
EP2719166 16.04.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201261646750 14.05.2012
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201261646732 14.05.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
WO2012US41756 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2719165Global Dossier 02.05.2018B1
EP2719165 16.04.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2719164Global Dossier 16.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2570989Global Dossier 08.05.2019B1
EP2570989 04.09.2013A3
EP2570989 20.03.2013A2
Priority number Date
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US76673910 23.04.2010
EP11163417 21.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2570988Global Dossier 28.08.2013A3
EP2570988 20.03.2013A2
Priority number Date
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US76673910 23.04.2010
EP11163417 21.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2438754Global Dossier 11.04.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2010US37320 03.06.2010
US47782809 03.06.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2404441Global Dossier 11.01.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2010US25671 26.02.2010
US39634009 02.03.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2381417Global Dossier 24.10.2012B1
EP2381417 26.10.2011A1
Priority number Date
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US76673910 23.04.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109618084Global Dossier 12.04.2019A
Priority number Date
CN201280038760 08.06.2012
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN106068446Global Dossier 02.11.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2013US78551 31.12.2013
US201461923732 05.01.2014
US201414299987 09.06.2014
US201414246006 04.04.2014
US201414281883 19.05.2014
WO2014US59200 03.10.2014
WO2014US73096 31.12.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105191288BGlobal Dossier 16.10.2018B
CN105191288 23.12.2015A
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201261747844 31.12.2012
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201314029683 17.09.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201314029716 17.09.2013
WO2013US78554 31.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105027557Global Dossier 04.11.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261747947 31.12.2012
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
WO2013US78369 30.12.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105009568BGlobal Dossier 18.12.2018B
CN105009568 28.10.2015A
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201314029683 17.09.2013
US201261745489 21.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314029716 17.09.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
WO2013US77346 21.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105009169BGlobal Dossier 09.03.2018B
CN105009169 28.10.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201314101245 09.12.2013
WO2013US77265 20.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201261745440 21.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104995910BGlobal Dossier 13.07.2018B
CN104995910 21.10.2015A
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201314029683 17.09.2013
US201261745489 21.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314029716 17.09.2013
WO2013US77343 21.12.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104995909BGlobal Dossier 31.05.2019B
CN104995909 21.10.2015A
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201314029683 17.09.2013
US201261745489 21.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314029716 17.09.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
WO2013US77342 21.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104981905BGlobal Dossier 25.09.2018B
CN104981905 14.10.2015A
Priority number Date
US201361793181 15.03.2013
WO2013US74828 12.12.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261737678 14.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104867123BGlobal Dossier 19.02.2019B
CN104867123 26.08.2015A
Priority number Date
CN201180000582 21.04.2011
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US76673910 23.04.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104813652BGlobal Dossier 09.03.2018B
CN104813652 29.07.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201261745489 21.12.2012
WO2013US60216 17.09.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104782116BGlobal Dossier 14.12.2016B
CN104782116 15.07.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261745504 21.12.2012
WO2013US60210 17.09.2013
US201213622178 18.09.2012
US201261745489 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104684465BGlobal Dossier 07.07.2017B
CN104684465 03.06.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261746074 26.12.2012
WO2013US50393 12.07.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201261670824 12.07.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104662891Global Dossier 27.05.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261672153 16.07.2012
WO2013EP65035 16.07.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104539855BGlobal Dossier 28.09.2016B
CN104539855 22.04.2015A
Priority number Date
CN201080018803 26.02.2010
US39634009 02.03.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104519254Global Dossier 15.04.2015A
Priority number Date
US201361886543 03.10.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104364800Global Dossier 18.02.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261618001 30.03.2012
WO2013EP56708 28.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103975577BGlobal Dossier 19.09.2017B
CN103975577 06.08.2014A
Priority number Date
US201261663336 22.06.2012
US201161545056 07.10.2011
WO2012US58099 28.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103931172Global Dossier 16.07.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
US201261656841 07.06.2012
WO2012US41755 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103907342BGlobal Dossier 23.10.2018B
CN103907342 02.07.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US49051 31.07.2012
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261616766 28.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103875235BGlobal Dossier 12.10.2018B
CN103875235 18.06.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103828343BGlobal Dossier 11.07.2017B
CN103828343 28.05.2014A
Priority number Date
US201261646750 14.05.2012
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201261646732 14.05.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
WO2012US41756 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103748867BGlobal Dossier 18.01.2019B
CN103748867 23.04.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261656889 07.06.2012
US201161495879 10.06.2011
US201161495888 10.06.2011
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103718541BGlobal Dossier 04.05.2018B
CN103718541 09.04.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103650130Global Dossier 19.03.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US41774 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102461156BGlobal Dossier 16.03.2016B
CN102461156 16.05.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2010US37320 03.06.2010
US47782809 03.06.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102415091BGlobal Dossier 31.12.2014B
CN102415091 11.04.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2010US25671 26.02.2010
US39634009 02.03.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102334141BGlobal Dossier 20.05.2015B
CN102334141 25.01.2012A
Priority number Date
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US76673910 23.04.2010
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2869741Global Dossier 11.12.2018C
CA2869741 10.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261621385 06.04.2012
US201313839118 15.03.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
WO2013US35149 03.04.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2867895Global Dossier 06.03.2018C
CA2867895 12.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2013US31734 14.03.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201313802615 13.03.2013
US201261612794 19.03.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2851259Global Dossier 12.06.2018C
CA2851259 11.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261663336 22.06.2012
US201161545056 07.10.2011
WO2012US58099 28.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2838992Global Dossier 01.05.2018C
CA2838992 13.12.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201161495873 10.06.2011
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201161495879 10.06.2011
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
US201161495888 10.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2797054Global Dossier 17.07.2018C
CA2797054 27.10.2011A1
Priority number Date
US201161473207 08.04.2011
US76673910 23.04.2010
WO2011EP56432 21.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2764685Global Dossier 13.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US49051 31.07.2012
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261616766 28.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112014008362 18.04.2017A2
Priority number Date
US201261663336 22.06.2012
US201161545056 07.10.2011
WO2012US58099 28.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN204442498U 01.07.2015U
Priority number Date
US201361886543 03.10.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN204465713U 08.07.2015U
Priority number Date
US201261621385 06.04.2012
US201313839118 15.03.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
WO2013US35149 03.04.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN204615945U 02.09.2015U
Priority number Date
WO2013US31734 14.03.2013
US201261656889 07.06.2012
WO2012US41749 08.06.2012
WO2012US41739 08.06.2012
US201313802615 13.03.2013
US201261612794 19.03.2012
WO2012US41744 08.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN204649311U 16.09.2015U
Priority number Date
US201261701292 14.09.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2013US59831 13.09.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN204927290U 30.12.2015U
Priority number Date
US201261737660 14.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
WO2013US74831 12.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN204967995U 13.01.2016U
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
WO2013US35149 03.04.2013
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201361882546 25.09.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
WO2013US77887 26.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201313839118 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN204991709U 20.01.2016U
Priority number Date
WO2013US72395 27.11.2013
US201261730435 27.11.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN204996085U 27.01.2016U
Priority number Date
US201462050726 15.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN205071130U 02.03.2016U
Priority number Date
US201261683124 14.08.2012
WO2013US54802 13.08.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN205080731U 09.03.2016U
Priority number Date
US201462050707 15.09.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN205157051U 13.04.2016U
Priority number Date
US201361790189 15.03.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261730031 26.11.2012
WO2013US72105 26.11.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN205157056U 13.04.2016U
Priority number Date
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
WO2013US76742 19.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201261745373 21.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN205157061U 13.04.2016U
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US201261748024 31.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
WO2013US77696 24.12.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN205160655U 13.04.2016U
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201261745504 21.12.2012
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201314029683 17.09.2013
US201261747736 31.12.2012
US201261745489 21.12.2012
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314029716 17.09.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
WO2013US77345 21.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN205175557U 20.04.2016U
Priority number Date
WO2013US78551 31.12.2013
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201261747789 31.12.2012
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
US201313966052 13.08.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN205212950U 04.05.2016U
Priority number Date
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201261748012 31.12.2012
WO2013US77681 24.12.2013
US201314138052 21.12.2013
US201361792582 15.03.2013
US201314138040 21.12.2013
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201361793952 15.03.2013
US201314138058 21.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN205265783U 25.05.2016U
Priority number Date
US201261746074 26.12.2012
US201314101245 09.12.2013
US201261745193 21.12.2012
US201314101258 09.12.2013
US201314099818 06.12.2013
US201361793952 15.03.2013
WO2013US77224 20.12.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
US201361792582 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN205449295U 10.08.2016U
Priority number Date
US201361880827 20.09.2013
US201313901428 23.05.2013
US201261748018 31.12.2012
US201261746069 26.12.2012
WO2013US62433 27.09.2013
US201361792582 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
USD765081S 30.08.2016S
Priority number Date
US201229423027 25.05.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013052196Global Dossier 11.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161545056 07.10.2011
US201261616766 28.03.2012