Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2764685

EP2764685 - DETERMINATION OF AN ABSOLUTE RADIOMETRIC VALUE USING BLOCKED INFRARED SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 16.01.2019  [2019/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Flir Systems, Inc.
27700 SW Parkway Avenue
Wilsonville, OR 97070 / US
[2014/33]
Inventor(s)01 / BOULANGER, Pierre
Flir Systems Inc.
70 Castilian Drive
Goleta, CA 93117-3027 / US
02 / ELMFORS, Per
Flir Systems Inc.
70 Castilian Drive
Goleta, CA 93117-3027 / US
03 / HÖGASTEN, Nicholas
Flir Systems Inc.
70 Castilian Drive
Goleta, CA 93117-3027 / US
04 / HOELTER, Theodore, R.
Flir Systems Inc.
70 Castilian Drive
Goleta, CA 93117-3027 / US
05 / STRANDEMAR, Katrin
Vastergarden 8171
SE-76294 Rimbo / SE
06 / SHARP, Barbara
Flir Systems Inc.
70 Castilian Drive
Goleta, CA 93117-3027 / US
07 / KURTH, Eric, A.
Flir Systems Inc.
70 Castilian Drive
Goleta, CA 93117-3027 / US
 [2014/33]
Representative(s)Kitzler, Michael
IPQ IP Specialists AB
Docketing
PO Box 42
683 21 Hagfors / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/33]Kitzler, Michael
IPQ IP Specialists AB
Docketing
Box 42
683 21 Hagfors / SE
Application number, filing date12751646.631.07.2012
WO2012US49051
Priority number, dateUS201161545056P07.10.2011         Original published format: US 201161545056 P
US201261616766P28.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261616766 P
[2014/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013052196
Date:11.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2764685
Date:13.08.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2013
[2014/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/33
[2014/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/33]
TitleGerman:BESTIMMUNG EINES ABSOLUTEN RADIOMETRISCHEN WERTES MITTELS BLOCKIERTER INFRAROTSENSOREN[2014/33]
English:DETERMINATION OF AN ABSOLUTE RADIOMETRIC VALUE USING BLOCKED INFRARED SENSORS[2014/33]
French:DÉTERMINATION D'UNE VALEUR RADIOMÉTRIQUE ABSOLUE À L'AIDE DE CAPTEURS INFRAROUGES BLOQUÉS[2014/33]
Entry into regional phase07.04.2014National basic fee paid 
07.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/33]
01.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.09.2018
03.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/03]
13.09.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/03]
14.09.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.05.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US4998826  (WOOD DON E [US], et al) [X] 1,6,11,16,21 * abstract * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 55 * * column 5, line 3 - column 5, line 5 * * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 54 * * column 9, line 36 - column 10, line 15 * [Y] 2-5,8-10,12-15,18-20 [I] 7,17;
 [Y]WO9855842  (SENSARRAY CORP [US], et al) [Y] 2-5,9,12-15,19 * abstract * * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 6 * * page 8, line 8 - page 8, line 19 * * page 11, line 6 - page 12, line 19 *;
 [Y]WO2005015143  (OPGAL LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 8,10,18,20 * abstract * * page 1, line 25 - page 1, line 27 * * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 2 * * page 8, line 1 - page 8, line 13 *
by applicantUS6028309
 US7470902
 US6812465
 US7034301
 US7679048
 US7470904
 US20100844124
 US20080202880
 US20080202896
 US20090396340
 US20080486508