Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2681641

EP2681641 - IMMERSIVE DISPLAY EXPERIENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.07.2018  [2018/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/17]
Former [2014/02]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PEREZ, Gritsko
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2014/02]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/02]Fischer, Michael Maria , et al
Olswang Germany LLP
IP
Rosental 4
80331 Munich / DE
Application number, filing date12752325.627.02.2012
WO2012US26823
Priority number, dateUS20111303917902.03.2011         Original published format: US201113039179
[2014/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012118769
Date:07.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2681641
Date:08.01.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2012
[2014/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.11.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/01, G06F3/14, G06F9/44, G03B21/00
[2014/35]
Former International [2014/02]G06F3/01, G06F3/14, G06F9/44
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/02]
TitleGerman:TIEFGEHENDES ANZEIGEERLEBNIS[2014/02]
English:IMMERSIVE DISPLAY EXPERIENCE[2014/02]
French:EXPÉRIENCE D'AFFICHAGE EN IMMERSION[2014/02]
Entry into regional phase29.08.2013National basic fee paid 
29.08.2013Search fee paid 
29.08.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
29.08.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.08.2013Examination requested  [2014/02]
06.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/28]
07.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/28]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.08.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2007126864  (BHAT KIRAN [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0118] * * paragraph [0172] * * figures 1-4, 16 *;
 [Y]WO2007134456  (SMART TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]; MORRISON GERALD [CA]; HOLMGREN DAVID E [C) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0034] * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2009091581  (LAPA YAN N [RU]) [A] 2 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]US2008095468  (KLEMMER THOMAS [DE] ET AL) [A] 2-6,10-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004257540  (ROY SEBASTIEN [CA] ET AL) [A] 2-4,6,10,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005017739  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; MEINDERS ERWIN R [NL]) [A] 1-14 * page 7, line 33 - page 11, line 9 * * page 11, line 33 - page 12, line 3 * * page 14, line 3 - page 15, line 9 * * page 15, line 33 - page 16, line 9 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2010201878  (BARENBRUG BART GERARD BERNARD [NL] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0063] * * figures 4, 5 *
by applicantUS2007126864
 WO2007134456