EP2751059 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING DI-SUBSTITUTED SUCCINATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saudi Basic Industries Corporation P.O. Box 5101 11422 Riyadh / SA | [2014/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAINANI, Jaiprakash Brijlal Sabic Research&Technology Pvt. Ltd. Plot N° 5&6 Savli G.I.D.C. Estate Savli - Baroda Highway Manjusar -391775 Dist. Baroda / IN | 02 /
DAVADRA, Mahesh B-11 Shilpa Bunglow Opp: Rameshwar vidyalaya Opp: Rameshwar vidyalaya, Gotri Road Vadodara 390 021 Gujarat / IN | [2014/28] | Representative(s) | Sabic Intellectual Property Group Sabic Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | [2015/38] |
Former [2014/28] | Heijman, Renske Harriët SABIC Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 12753071.5 | 23.08.2012 | [2015/38] | WO2012EP03571 | Priority number, date | EP20110007014 | 29.08.2011 Original published format: EP 11007014 | [2014/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013029767 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2751059 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2751059 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/38, C07C55/02, C07C57/34, C07C51/09, C07C55/22, C07C67/343, C07C69/34, C07C69/612, C07C67/08, C07C69/40 | [2014/28] | CPC: |
C07C67/343 (EP,CN,US);
C07C67/08 (EP,CN,US);
C08F4/76 (US);
C07C51/09 (EP,CN,US);
C08F10/00 (CN)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/09, C07C55/02 (CN,EP,US);
C07C51/09, C07C57/34 (CN,EP,US);
C07C67/08, C07C69/34 (US,CN,EP);
C07C67/08, C07C69/618 (US,CN,EP);
C07C67/343, C07C69/34 (US,CN,EP);
C07C67/343, C07C69/618 (US,CN,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DI-SUBSTITUIERTER SUCCINATE | [2014/28] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING DI-SUBSTITUTED SUCCINATES | [2014/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE SUCCINATES DISUBSTITUÉS | [2014/28] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/28] | 02.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.08.2012 | AL | 16.09.2015 | BE | 16.09.2015 | BG | 16.09.2015 | CY | 16.09.2015 | CZ | 16.09.2015 | DK | 16.09.2015 | EE | 16.09.2015 | ES | 16.09.2015 | FI | 16.09.2015 | GR | 16.09.2015 | HR | 16.09.2015 | IT | 16.09.2015 | LT | 16.09.2015 | LV | 16.09.2015 | MC | 16.09.2015 | MK | 16.09.2015 | NL | 16.09.2015 | PL | 16.09.2015 | RO | 16.09.2015 | RS | 16.09.2015 | SE | 16.09.2015 | SI | 16.09.2015 | SK | 16.09.2015 | SM | 16.09.2015 | TR | 16.09.2015 | NO | 16.12.2015 | IS | 16.01.2016 | PT | 18.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 23.08.2012 | |
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 23.08.2012 | |
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.08.2012 | |
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 23.08.2012 | |
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | BE | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 16.09.2015 | |
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 16.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1179529 (DAIICHI FINE CHEM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0058] *; | [AD]US6818583 (MORINI GIAMPIERO [IT], et al) [AD] 1-11 * column 9, line 58 - column 11, line 63; claims 1, 9 *; | [AD] - P. H. PAYOT, "Die Alkylierung von Formylbernsteinsaureester", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (19590101), vol. 42, no. 4, doi:10.1002/hlca.19590420436, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 1356 - 1367, XP055017099 [AD] 1-11 * page 1366, paragraphs 7,8; compounds IVh, IVi * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19590420436 | [AD] - F F Van Leeuwen ET AL, "Synthesis of the 2-ethyl-3-methylsuccinic acids via a stereospecific malonic ester alkylation", Recueil des Travaux Chimiques des Pays-Bas, doi:10.1002/recl.19800990307, (20100902), pages 96 - 99, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/store/10.1002/recl.19800990307/asset/19800990307_ftp.pdf?v=1&t=gxnd4vii&s=d4f631944b6bd8bf54bcaa2ae64788af571ce768, (20120120), XP055017123 [AD] 1-11 * scheme p 97,;; compounds 3-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/recl.19800990307 | by applicant | US4579836 | US4612299 | US5066737 | US5567665 | WO9845338 | US6268306 | EP1336625 | US2003181743 | US6818583 | - SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (1981), vol. 11, no. 9, page 687697 | - SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (1981), vol. 11, no. 9, pages 687 - 697 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1977), vol. 23, pages 2009 - 2012 | - JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1971), vol. 93, page 4605 | - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 61, page 2809 | - JOURNAL OF THE ROYAL NETHERLANDS CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (198003), page 9913 | - HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1959), vol. 42, no. 4, pages 1356 - 1367 |