Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2773197

EP2773197 - ANTIMICROBIAL IONOMER COMPOSITION AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nolla Antimicrobial Limited
Vincenti Buildings
28/19 (Suite 1338) Strait Street
VLT1432 Valletta / MT
[2018/09]
Former [2014/37]For all designated states
Argenlab Global Ltd
Vincenti Buildings
29/19 (Suite 1338) Strait Street
Valletta LVT 1432 / MT
Inventor(s)01 / MÄKI, Markus
c/o SilverPhasE Oy
Viikinkaari 6
FI-00790 Helsinki / FI
02 / NIEMINEN, Jyri
c/o SilverPhasE Oy
Viikinkaari 6
FI-00790 Helsinki / FI
03 / LAAKSONEN, Harri
c/o SilverPhasE Oy
Viikinkaari 6
FI-00790 Helsinki / FI
04 / AREVA, Sami
c/o SilverPhasE Oy
Viikinkaari 6
FI-00790 Helsinki / FI
 [2014/37]
Representative(s)Seppo Laine Oy
Porkkalankatu 24
00180 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2014/37]Seppo Laine Oy
Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date12753150.722.08.2012
[2017/40]
WO2012FI50803
Priority number, dateFI2011000581622.08.2011         Original published format: FI 20115816
US201161525888P22.08.2011         Original published format: US 201161525888 P
[2014/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013026961
Date:28.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2773197
Date:10.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013
[2014/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2773197
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:A01N25/24, A01N59/16, A01N25/10, A01N25/34, A01N25/22, C08K3/16, C08K3/00, C08K5/00, C08L79/02, C08L23/00, D06M11/13, D06M15/00, D06M15/61, D06M16/00
[2017/03]
Former International [2014/37]A01N25/24, A01N59/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANTIMIKROBIELLE IONOMER-ZUBEREITUNG SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNGEN[2017/03]
English:ANTIMICROBIAL IONOMER COMPOSITION AND USES THEREOF[2014/37]
French:COMPOSITION D'IONOMÈRE ANTIMICROBIENNE ET UTILISATIONS DE CELLE-CI[2014/37]
Former [2014/37]ANTIMIKROBIELLE IONOMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG
Entry into regional phase20.03.2014National basic fee paid 
20.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/37]
23.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
21.08.2017Fee for grant paid
21.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17194568.6  / EP3400799
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.10.2015
Opposition(s)05.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
21.08.2017Request for further processing filed
21.08.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
31.08.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
18.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHR04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
[2019/15]
Former [2018/52]HR04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
Former [2018/40]HR04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
Former [2018/38]HR04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
Former [2018/25]HR04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
Cited inInternational search[YD]WO0230204  (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH [KR], et al) [YD] 1-34 * claims 2,4 * * page 6, lines 20-24 * * page 7, lines 9-20 *;
 [XY]WO9818330  (SURFACINE CONSUMER PRODUCTS [US], et al) [X] 1,7-9,13,25-27,31-34 * claims 1,4,7 * * page 17, lines 1-3, 19-21 * * example 13 * [Y] 1-34;
 [XY]US6224898  (BALOGH LAJOS [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,8,15,23-25 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 28 * * column 4, line 9 * * column 6, lines 16-38 * * claims 1,7 * * table 1: 2nd entry (AgCl) * [Y] 1-34
by applicantWO0230204
 US2009246258