Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2734559

EP2734559 - POLYMERIC STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.02.2016  [2016/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Surface Innovations Limited
127 (9-12 North) Milton Park
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 4SA / GB
[2014/22]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHOFIELD, Wayne Christopher Edward
Department of Chemistry
Science Laboratories
Durham University
Durham DH1 3LE / GB
02 / MORSCH, Suzanne
Department of Chemistry
Science Laboratories
Durham University
Durham DH1 3LE / GB
03 / BADYAL, Jas Pal Singh
Department of Chemistry
Science Laboratories
Durham University
Durham DH1 3LE / GB
 [2014/22]
Representative(s)Fry, Emma Leland , et al
Greaves Brewster LLP
Copa House
Station Road
Cheddar, North Somerset BS27 3AH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/22]Leland, Emma Clare , et al
Greaves Brewster LLP
Copa House
Station Road
Cheddar, North Somerset BS27 3AH / GB
Application number, filing date12753182.019.07.2012
WO2012GB51721
Priority number, dateGB2011001236919.07.2011         Original published format: GB 201112369
[2014/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013011314
Date:24.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2734559
Date:28.05.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013
[2014/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:C08F293/00, C08J7/16
[2014/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/22]
TitleGerman:POLYMERSTRUKTUR[2014/22]
English:POLYMERIC STRUCTURE[2014/22]
French:STRUCTURE POLYMÈRE[2014/22]
Entry into regional phase14.02.2014National basic fee paid 
14.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/22]
04.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/06]
05.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/06]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2006097719  (UNIV DURHAM [GB], et al) [X] 1-14 * examples 2,7,8,9; claim - *;
 [XA]WO2009130233  (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * example -; claim - * [A] 15;
 [XA]WO2010054979  (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * example -; claim - * [A] 15;
 [X]  - IWATA ET AL, "Covalent immobilization of antibody fragments on well-defined polymer brushes via site-directed method", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES. B, BIOINTERFACES, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071104), vol. 62, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.COLSURFB.2007.10.018, ISSN 0927-7765, pages 288 - 298, XP022495042 [X] 1-14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.colsurfb.2007.10.018
 [A]  - KUROSAWA S ET AL, "Synthesis of tethered-polymer brush by atom transfer radical polymerization from a plasma-polymerized-film-coated quartz crystal microbalance and its application for immunosensors", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20041215), vol. 20, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.BIOS.2004.06.034, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 1165 - 1176, XP004648760 [A] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bios.2004.06.034
 [AD]  - TEARE D O H ET AL, "Substrate-Independent Approach for Polymer Brush Growth by Surface Atom Transfer Radical Polymerization", LANGMUIR, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY; US, (20051008), vol. 21, no. 24, doi:10.1021/LA051772H, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 11425 - 11430, XP002381754 [AD] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la051772h
by applicantWO9858117
 WO2005089961
 WO0228548
    - TEARE, D.O.H.; BARWICK, D.C.; SCHOFIELD, W.C.E.; GARROD, R.P.; WARD, L.J.; BADYAL, J.P.S., LANGMUIR, (2005), vol. 21, page 11425