EP2747611 - CARTRIDGE CHAMBER OF EXTRACTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2014/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESSON, François Chemin des Ruaux 26 2013 Colombier / CH | 02 /
RITHENER, Blaise Ch de la Crausaz 40 1814 La Tour-de-Peilz / CH | 03 /
LARZUL, David 45 rue Louis Aragon 69330 Meyzieu / FR | 04 /
CHALENCON, Julien 30 Rue du Stade 42800 Châteauneuf / FR | [2017/39] |
Former [2014/27] | 01 /
BESSON, François Chemin des Ruaux 26 CH-2013 Colombier / CH | ||
02 /
RITHENER, Blaise Ch de la Crausaz 40 CH-1814 La Tour-de-Peilz / CH | |||
03 /
LARZUL, David 45 rue Louis Aragon F-69330 Meyzieu / FR | |||
04 /
CHALENCON, Julien 30 Rue du Stade F-42800 Châteauneuf / FR | Representative(s) | Schnyder, Frank Simon Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/39] | Schnyder, Frank Simon Nestec S.A. Centre de Recherche Nestlé Vers-chez-les-Blanc Case Postale 44 1000 Lausanne 26 / CH | ||
Former [2014/27] | Schnyder, Frank Simon Nestec S.A. CT-IAM Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 12753452.7 | 21.08.2012 | [2017/39] | WO2012EP66238 | Priority number, date | EP20110178789 | 25.08.2011 Original published format: EP 11178789 | [2014/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013026843 | Date: | 28.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2747611 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2747611 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/40, A47J31/36 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
A47J31/3628 (EP,RU,US);
A47J31/407 (US);
A47J31/0668 (US);
A47J31/3633 (EP,US);
A47J31/3638 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/27] | A47J31/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KARTUSCHENKAMMER EINES EXTRAKTIONSSYSTEMS | [2014/27] | English: | CARTRIDGE CHAMBER OF EXTRACTION SYSTEM | [2014/27] | French: | CHAMBRE DE CARTOUCHE DE SYSTÈME D'EXTRACTION | [2016/40] |
Former [2014/27] | CHAMBRE POUR CARTOUCHE D'UN SYSTÈME D'EXTRACTION | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 09.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.08.2012 | AL | 27.09.2017 | CY | 27.09.2017 | CZ | 27.09.2017 | DK | 27.09.2017 | EE | 27.09.2017 | FI | 27.09.2017 | HR | 27.09.2017 | LT | 27.09.2017 | LV | 27.09.2017 | MC | 27.09.2017 | MK | 27.09.2017 | PL | 27.09.2017 | RO | 27.09.2017 | RS | 27.09.2017 | SE | 27.09.2017 | SI | 27.09.2017 | SK | 27.09.2017 | SM | 27.09.2017 | TR | 27.09.2017 | BG | 27.12.2017 | NO | 27.12.2017 | GR | 28.12.2017 | IS | 27.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 21.08.2012 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 21.08.2012 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 27.09.2017 | |
NO | 27.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]EP0710462 (ILLYCAFFE SPA [IT]) [X] 1,15 * abstract * * page 2, column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 1 * * page 3, column 3, line 25 - line 29 * * claim 4 * [Y] 7-14 [I] 2-6; | [YDA]EP1219217 (SGL ITALIA SRL [IT]) [YD] 11-13 * abstract * * page 4, column 4, line 43, paragraph 19 - line 44 * * page 6, column 7, paragraph 37 * [A] 1-10,14,15; | [YDA]EP1859714 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [YD] 7-10 * abstract * * figure 4 * * page 6, column 8, paragraph 54 - line 40 * * page 7, column 9, paragraph 63 * [A] 1-6,11-15; | [YA]WO2010149468 (BRASILIA SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 14 * abstract * * figures 1,6,7 * * page 8, line 5 - line 9 *[A] 1-13,15 | by applicant | US3260190 | FR2424010 | US4760774 | US5531152 | EP0730425 | EP0862882 | EP1219217 | EP1353591 | EP1480540 | WO2005002405 | WO2005004683 | WO2005016093 | US2005106288 | US6904840 | EP1545278 | WO2005072574 | EP1566126 | US6966251 | WO2005115206 | WO2006005756 | WO2006005736 | WO2006023309 | EP1635680 | US2006102008 | EP1659547 | EP1669011 | WO2006066626 | US7131369 | EP1721553 | EP1774878 | EP1776026 | WO2007135136 | WO2007135135 | EP1893064 | WO2008037642 | EP1912542 | WO2009074550 | WO2009130099 | WO2011000723 | WO2011000724 | WO2011000725 | WO2011042400 |