Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2754137 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2754137



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1185
09.03.2023 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.03.2023 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
06.02.2023 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 57
06.02.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
06.02.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
19.12.2022 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.12.2022 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.12.2022 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 5
31.10.2022 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.10.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.10.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.10.2022 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 5
27.10.2022 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 5
26.10.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.10.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
26.10.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
21.10.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.10.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.10.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
21.10.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.10.2022 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
20.10.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.10.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.10.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
13.10.2022 Request for a change of address - opponent Appeal 1
07.10.2022 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
07.10.2022 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
30.09.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.09.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
29.09.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
29.09.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
29.09.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
29.09.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
29.09.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
29.09.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 3
29.09.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 3
29.09.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 Appeal 4
29.09.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 Appeal 3
29.09.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 Appeal 4
29.09.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
29.09.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.09.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 40
29.04.2022 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 33
29.04.2022 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 33
03.03.2022 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.03.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
02.03.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
25.02.2022 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
18.01.2022 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
17.01.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.01.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.01.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.01.2022 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 24
17.12.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.12.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.12.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.12.2021 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.08.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.08.2021 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
13.08.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.08.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.08.2021 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 29
09.10.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.10.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.10.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.10.2020 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 39
12.02.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.02.2020 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
23.10.2019 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
08.10.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.10.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.10.2019 Reply to appeal Appeal 15
27.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.09.2019 Reply to appeal Appeal 12
13.06.2019 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.06.2019 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
07.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.06.2019 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
07.06.2019 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 32
07.06.2019 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 28
07.06.2019 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 40
17.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.05.2019 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
14.05.2019 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
14.05.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.05.2019 Request concerning representative opponent Appeal 1
04.04.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
04.04.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
04.04.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
04.04.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
01.04.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
29.03.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.02.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.02.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.02.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.02.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.02.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 13
01.02.2019 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
01.02.2019 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 11
01.02.2019 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
01.02.2019 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
01.02.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
01.02.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
01.02.2019 Means of redress Opposition 2
01.02.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
01.02.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
01.02.2019 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.02.2019 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.02.2019 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.02.2019 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.02.2019 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.12.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 8
06.12.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.12.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
28.11.2018 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
21.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
21.11.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.10.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 11
09.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
09.10.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 7
09.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
09.10.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
09.10.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.10.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
16.02.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.02.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.02.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.02.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.02.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.02.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.02.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 9
02.02.2018 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
02.02.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.02.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
22.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
22.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
22.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
22.12.2017 Claims Opposition 4
22.12.2017 Claims Opposition 4
22.12.2017 Claims Opposition 4
22.12.2017 Claims Opposition 3
22.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.12.2017 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 15
06.09.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
06.09.2017 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
16.08.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.08.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
02.08.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
02.08.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
02.08.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
02.08.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
02.08.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
02.08.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 54
02.08.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
02.08.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
02.08.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
02.08.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.08.2017 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
03.11.2016 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
07.10.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.09.2016 Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) Search / examination 2
27.09.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
13.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.09.2016 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
13.09.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
13.09.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
13.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.06.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.06.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.06.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.06.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 18
17.06.2016 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 18
04.03.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.02.2016 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
28.08.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
28.08.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.07.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
01.04.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
01.04.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.03.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.02.2015 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.09.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
25.09.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
25.09.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
25.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.06.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.04.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
11.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.03.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
20.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.02.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 10
20.02.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
17.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
03.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 19
14.03.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
14.03.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
14.03.2013 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 19
21.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 2
21.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
21.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 2