Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2747791

EP2747791 - PROTECTIVE WOUND DRESSING DEVICE FOR ORAL AND PHARYNGEAL SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.08.2018  [2018/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ethicon, Inc.
U.S. Route 22
Somerville, NJ 08876 / US
[2014/27]
Inventor(s)01 / KEPLINGER, Scott, Alan
17 Current Lane
Durham, NC 27712 / US
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/27]
Application number, filing date12754164.721.08.2012
WO2012US51691
Priority number, dateUS20111321785225.08.2011         Original published format: US201113217852
[2014/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013028672
Date:28.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2747791
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013
[2014/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61L15/24, A61L15/32, A61L15/58, A61L15/62, A61L15/64, A61L24/06, A61L26/00, A61F13/12
[2017/41]
Former International [2014/27]A61L15/24, A61L15/32, A61L15/58, A61L15/62, A61L15/64, A61L24/06, A61L26/00, A61F13/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
Extension statesBA24.03.2014
ME24.03.2014
TitleGerman:SCHÜTZENDE WUNDVERBANDVORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN MUND- UND RACHENRAUM[2014/27]
English:PROTECTIVE WOUND DRESSING DEVICE FOR ORAL AND PHARYNGEAL SPACE[2014/27]
French:DISPOSITIF PROTECTEUR DE PANSEMENT DE PLAIE DESTINÉ À UN ESPACE ORAL ET PHARYNGÉ[2014/27]
Entry into regional phase24.03.2014National basic fee paid 
24.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/27]
02.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2017Fee for grant paid
10.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
01.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/32]
28.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/32]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.03.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US2006251612  (KOTZEV DIMITER [GB], et al) [A] 1-5,10-15 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] , [0026] - [0030] - [0034] , [0036] - [0043] - [0045] , [0053]; example -; claim - *;
 [A]US2011152924  (GENSINI MICHEL [US], et al) [A] 1-5,10-15 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0015] , [0021] , [0031] , [0046] , [0047]; example -; claim - *;
 [A]US6632450  (GREGORY KENTON W [US]) [A] 1-5,10-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6559350
 US5328687
 US5928611
 US6183593
 US2721858
 US3254111
 US3995641
 US4364876
 US6620846
 US6352704
 US6455064
 US6579469
 US6595940
    - REILLY JS ET AL., "Size/shape analysis of aerodigestive foreign bodies in children: a multi-institutional study", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF OTOLARYNGOLOGY, (1995), vol. 16, pages 190 - 193,
    - SCLAFANI AP; JACONO AA; DOLITSKY, "Grafting of the peritonsillar fossa with an acellular dermal graft to reduce posttonsillectomy pain", AM J OTOLARYNGOL, (2001), vol. 22, pages 409 - 414,
    - RAMJETTAN S; SINGH B, "Are sutured faucial pillars really an advantage in tonsillectomy?", SAJS, (1996), vol. 34, pages 189 - 191,
    - GLEESON, DC., "Oropharyngeal swallowing and aging: A review", ! COMMUN. DISORD, (1999), vol. 32, pages 373 - 396,
 US20070704115
 US20050124831
 US19990430177
 US20010919877
 US19990430289
 US19990430180
 US19990385030
 US19980176889