Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2748365

EP2748365 - RADIALLY COLLAPSIBLE AND EXPANDABLE TEXTILE SLEEVE AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Powertrain LLC
27300 West Eleven Mile Road
Southfield, MI 48034 / US
[2018/21]
Former [2018/20]For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Powertrain, Inc.
27300 West Eleven Mile Road
Southfield MI 48034 / US
Former [2014/27]For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Powertrain, Inc.
26555 Northwestern Highway
Southfield, MI 48033 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BURDY, John, E.
130 Lakeview Drive
Elverson, PA 19520 / US
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
4th Floor
Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]Barker, Rosemary Anne , et al
HGF Limited
4th Floor, Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
Application number, filing date12754171.222.08.2012
WO2012US51791
Priority number, dateUS201161525967P22.08.2011         Original published format: US 201161525967 P
[2014/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013028718
Date:28.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2748365
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013
[2014/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:D06C7/02, D03D13/00, D03D1/00, H02G3/04
[2014/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
TitleGerman:RADIAL ZUSAMMENDRÜCKBARE UND EXPANDIERBARE TEXTILHÜLSE SOWIE KONSTRUKTIONSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/27]
English:RADIALLY COLLAPSIBLE AND EXPANDABLE TEXTILE SLEEVE AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION THEREOF[2014/27]
French:MANCHON TEXTILE RADIALEMENT RÉTRACTABLE ET EXTENSIBLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONSTRUCTION DE CE DERNIER[2014/27]
Entry into regional phase20.02.2014National basic fee paid 
20.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/27]
10.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/28]
19.02.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/28]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.09.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
05.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2009218002  (KASHIHARA EMI [JP]) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0021]; figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [Y]WO2007103779  (FEDERAL MOGUL CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0003] , [0006] , [0007] , [0009] , [0027] , [0028]; figures 1-11; claim 1 *;
 [Y]WO2007121210  (FEDERAL MOGUL CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0002] - [0010] - [0015] , [0019] - [0024] - [0031]; figures 1-7; claim 1 *