Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2680929

EP2680929 - GAME PIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR, SE
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Smart Naamloze Vennootschap
Neerveld 14
2550 Kontich / BE
[2014/02]
Inventor(s)01 / VANDOREN, Rolf
Koningin Astridlaaan 55
2550 Kontich / BE
 [2014/02]
Representative(s)Donné, Eddy , et al
Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv.
Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Antwerpen / BE
[2018/46]
Former [2014/23]Kamphuis, Albertus Johannes
Bureau MFJ Bockstael
Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Antwerpen / BE
Former [2014/02]Donné, Eddy
Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Antwerpen / BE
Application number, filing date12754209.002.03.2012
[2018/46]
WO2012BE00011
Priority number, dateBE2011000015004.03.2011         Original published format: BE 201100150
[2014/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012119209
Date:13.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/37]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2680929
Date:08.01.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2012
[2014/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2680929
Date:14.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.12.2012
ClassificationInternational:A63F9/12, A63H33/04
[2014/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPIELELEMENTE[2014/02]
English:GAME PIECES[2014/02]
French:PIÈCES DE JEU[2014/02]
Entry into regional phase17.09.2013National basic fee paid 
17.09.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.09.2013Examination requested  [2014/02]
08.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.06.2018
04.06.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
26.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.2018Fee for grant paid
08.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.04.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
17.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
03.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
19.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
[2019/24]
Former [2019/23]AT14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
NO14.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT14.11.2018
NO14.02.2019
Cited inInternational search[I]US2005197039  (BENTLEY CHARLES W JR [US]) [I] 1,2,4,12-15 * figure 2 *;
 [Y]US6264522  (DICKSON MARILYN M [US]) [Y] 1 * figures 8,9 *;
 [IY]GB2090751  (POLITOYS IPARI SZOEVETKEZET) [I] 1-4,13-15 * page 7, lines 101-123; figure 24 * [Y] 1,16,17;
 [Y]EP1716894  (LONPOS BRAINTELLIGENT CO LTD [TW]) [Y] 1,16,17 * paragraph [0026]; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US5503497  (DUDLEY JAMES P [US], et al) [A] 5-8,10 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS4617001