blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2680929


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019 [2019/26]
17.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.06.2019  [2019/25]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
12.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
12.10.2018 (Expected) grant published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
10.10.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
10.10.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
09.10.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
25.06.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.05.2018 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
22.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.01.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
07.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.07.2016 Change - representative
13.07.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.06.2016 Change - representative
26.04.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.04.2016 First examination report
22.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.05.2014 Change - extension states published on  11.06.2014  [2014/24]
02.05.2014 Change - representative published on  04.06.2014  [2014/23]
28.04.2014 Amendment by applicant
08.04.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.12.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.01.2014  [2014/02]
06.12.2013 Request for examination filed published on  08.01.2014  [2014/02]
21.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
22.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
03.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
24.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
28.12.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
28.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
14.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication