blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2680929 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280018829 CN201280018863 EP12720390 EP12754209



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2012119209Global Dossier 27.12.2012A3
WO2012119209 13.09.2012A2
Priority number Date
BE201100150 04.03.2011
WO2012BE00011 02.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9987549Global Dossier 05.06.2018B2
US2013341868 26.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
BE201100150 04.03.2011
WO2012BE00010 01.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9295904Global Dossier 29.03.2016B2
US2013341867 26.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
BE201100150 04.03.2011
WO2012BE00011 02.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2680928Global Dossier 19.12.2018B1
EP2680928 08.01.2014A1
Priority number Date
BE201100150 04.03.2011
WO2012BE00010 01.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103501863BGlobal Dossier 10.08.2016B
CN103501863 08.01.2014A
Priority number Date
BE201100150 04.03.2011
WO2012BE00010 01.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103492035BGlobal Dossier 19.10.2016B
CN103492035 01.01.2014A
Priority number Date
BE201100150 04.03.2011
WO2012BE00011 02.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2680929Global Dossier 14.11.2018B1
EP2680929 08.01.2014A2
Priority number Date
BE201100150 04.03.2011
WO2012BE00011 02.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2709629T 17.04.2019T3
Priority number Date
BE201100150 04.03.2011
WO2012BE00011 02.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2712949T 16.05.2019T3
Priority number Date
BE201100150 04.03.2011
WO2012BE00010 01.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2680928T 31.07.2019T3
Priority number Date
BE201100150 04.03.2011
WO2012BE00010 01.03.2012
EP12720390 01.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2680929T 31.05.2019T3
Priority number Date
BE201100150 04.03.2011
EP12754209 02.03.2012
WO2012BE00011 02.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2601923 10.11.2016C2
RU2013144586 10.04.2015A
Priority number Date
BE201100150 04.03.2011
WO2012BE00011 02.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2612656 13.03.2017C2
RU2013144589 10.04.2015A
Priority number Date
BE201100150 04.03.2011
WO2012BE00010 01.03.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2012119208Global Dossier 13.09.2012A1
Priority number Date
BE201100150 04.03.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BE1019858 08.01.2013A3
Priority number Date
BE201100150 04.03.2011