Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2729689

EP2729689 - PISTON FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.02.2017
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mahle International GmbH
Pragstraße 26-46
70376 Stuttgart / DE
[2014/20]
Inventor(s)01 / BISCHOFBERGER, Ulrich
Hegensberger Strasse 137
73732 Esslingen / DE
 [2014/20]
Representative(s)BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater , et al
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/20]Pohle, Reinhard
Mahle International GmbH Patentabteilung CRP Pragstrasse 26-46
70376 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date12755778.304.07.2012
WO2012DE00670
Priority number, dateDE20111010656205.07.2011         Original published format: DE102011106562
DE20111011633219.10.2011         Original published format: DE102011116332
[2014/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013004215
Date:10.01.2013
Language:DE
[2013/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2729689
Date:14.05.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013
[2014/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:F02F3/22, F01P3/10
[2014/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/20]
TitleGerman:KOLBEN FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR[2014/20]
English:PISTON FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE[2014/20]
French:PISTON POUR UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE[2014/20]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2014National basic fee paid 
31.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/20]
29.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
30.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]DE4018252  (MAN B & W DIESEL AG [DE]) [X] 1-9,13-15 * column 2 - column 3 *;
 [X]JP2009215978  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-6,8 * figure 20 *;
 [X]DE1751342  (ALCAN ALUMINIUMWERKE) [X] 1-4 * figure - *;
 [X]DE102006022413  (KS KOLBENSCHMIDT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 4,5 *;
 [X]DE102006013884  (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * figure - *