Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2758823

EP2758823 - TRANSILLUMINATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR LIGHT MICROSCOPES, AND A MICROSCOPE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.10.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Zeiss Microscopy GmbH
Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10
07745 Jena / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/31]For all designated states
Carl Zeiss Microscopy GmbH
Carl Zeiss Promenade 10
07745 Jena / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HEIN, Detlef
Am Feuerschanzengraben 3
37083 Göttingen / DE
 [2014/31]
Representative(s)Schiffer, Axel Martin , et al
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/31]Schiffer, Axel Martin , et al
Weber & Heim Patentanwälte
Irmgardstrasse 3
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date12756091.016.08.2012
WO2012EP03498
Priority number, dateDE20111011433623.09.2011         Original published format: DE102011114336
[2014/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013041173
Date:28.03.2013
Language:DE
[2013/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2758823
Date:30.07.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:G02B21/08
[2014/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/31]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHLICHTBELEUCHTUNG FÜR LICHTMIKROSKOPE UND MIKROSKOPSYSTEM[2014/31]
English:TRANSILLUMINATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR LIGHT MICROSCOPES, AND A MICROSCOPE SYSTEM[2014/31]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉCLAIRAGE PAR TRANSMISSION POUR DES MICROSCOPES OPTIQUES ET SYSTÈME DE MICROSCOPE[2014/31]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2014National basic fee paid 
31.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/31]
05.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.10.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2001005280  (OUCHI YUMIKO [JP]) [Y] 1-27 * paragraph [0004]; figure 10 *;
 [Y]JP2002189174  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [Y] 1-27 * paragraph [0071] *;
 [Y]US2005259320  (FUJIMURA KAORI [JP]) [Y] 1-27 * paragraph [0174]; figure 15 *
by applicantDE102004056685
 DE102004017694
 US2002191281
 EP1008884
 JP2008026924