blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2751941 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2751941



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 204
30.04.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.03.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.03.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
05.03.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
05.03.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
05.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.11.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.11.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
23.11.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
23.11.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
23.11.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 20
31.10.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
05.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
05.09.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
05.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
06.05.2014 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
30.04.2014 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
11.04.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
09.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.03.2014 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
15.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.01.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
10.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
10.12.2013 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.12.2013 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
10.12.2013 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
10.12.2013 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.11.2013 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
15.10.2013 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.10.2013 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
15.10.2013 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
24.07.2013 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
27.06.2013 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
26.06.2013 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.06.2013 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
26.06.2013 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.06.2013 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.06.2013 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
21.06.2013 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.03.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 28
07.03.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
07.03.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 21
21.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
21.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
21.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
30.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
30.08.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
30.08.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
30.08.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 15
30.08.2012 Drawings PCT receiving Office 2