blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2751941


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.03.2019 (Expected) grant published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
08.03.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.03.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.03.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
22.11.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.09.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.09.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.11.2014 Change - extension states published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
05.09.2014 Amendment by applicant
04.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.06.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.07.2014  [2014/28]
06.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  09.07.2014  [2014/28]
30.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
25.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
21.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
18.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication