blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2751941 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280041919 EP12756161



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9729259Global Dossier 08.08.2017B2
US2014211816 31.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012EP66895 30.08.2012
US201161530763 02.09.2011
US201214238753 30.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20140065409Global Dossier 29.05.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012EP66895 30.08.2012
US201161530763 02.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6174581BGlobal Dossier 02.08.2017B2
JP2014529245 30.10.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012EP66895 30.08.2012
US201161530763 02.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103797734BGlobal Dossier 12.09.2017B
CN103797734 14.05.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012EP66895 30.08.2012
US201161530763 02.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2751941Global Dossier 17.04.2019B1
EP2751941 09.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012EP66895 30.08.2012
US201161530763 02.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112014003824 13.06.2017A2
Priority number Date
WO2012EP66895 30.08.2012
US201161530763 02.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013030298Global Dossier 07.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161530763 02.09.2011