Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2751941

EP2751941 - A SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING A POINT IN TIME OF RECEIPT OF A DATA PACKET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Napatech A/S
Tobaksvejen 23A
2860 Søborg / DK
[2014/28]
Inventor(s)01 / EKNER, Peter
Løngangsgade 34C
DK-3400 Hillerød / DK
 [2014/28]
Representative(s)Inspicos P/S
Kogle Allé 2
2970 Hørsholm / DK
[2019/16]
Former [2014/28]Inspicos A/S
Kogle Allé 2
P.O. Box 45
2970 Hørsholm / DK
Application number, filing date12756161.130.08.2012
[2019/16]
WO2012EP66895
Priority number, dateUS201161530763P02.09.2011         Original published format: US 201161530763 P
[2014/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013030298
Date:07.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2751941
Date:09.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013
[2014/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2751941
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04J3/06, H03M9/00
[2014/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINES ZEITPUNKTES DES EMPFANGS EINES DATENPAKETS[2014/28]
English:A SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING A POINT IN TIME OF RECEIPT OF A DATA PACKET[2014/28]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION D'UN INSTANT DE RÉCEPTION D'UN PAQUET DE DONNÉES[2014/28]
Entry into regional phase02.04.2014National basic fee paid 
02.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/28]
05.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2019Fee for grant paid
05.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2006050827  (SAEKI TAKANORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0091] * * figures 1,2,3,7 * [I] 3,7,8;
 [I]US7535844  (GULSTONE NIGEL A [US]) [I] 1-9 * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 17 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 50 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US2007229342  (BABA MITSUO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0050] * * figures 1,5 *