Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2753168 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2753168



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 965
26.09.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
18.02.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.02.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.02.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 29
05.02.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 29
05.02.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.02.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 1
23.01.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
14.12.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
10.12.2018 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Search / examination 4
28.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.11.2018 Observations by third parties Appeal 3
23.11.2018 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
22.11.2018 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
22.11.2018 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
20.11.2018 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
20.11.2018 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
20.11.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 13
19.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.11.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 5
15.11.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
14.11.2018 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
14.11.2018 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
13.11.2018 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
13.11.2018 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
12.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.11.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 6
07.11.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
26.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.10.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
26.10.2018 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
26.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
26.10.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
26.10.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 28
04.10.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 8
10.09.2018 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
10.09.2018 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
05.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.09.2018 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 12
05.09.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
27.08.2018 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
27.08.2018 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
20.08.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 5
20.08.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
13.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.08.2018 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
01.08.2018 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
30.07.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
30.07.2018 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
27.07.2018 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Appeal 40
27.07.2018 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Appeal 2
27.07.2018 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Appeal 131
27.07.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 13
27.07.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
25.07.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
21.06.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
20.06.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.05.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
02.05.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
23.04.2018 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
18.04.2018 Refund of fees Appeal 1
05.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.04.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 71
05.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
05.04.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
05.04.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 22
03.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.04.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.03.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
22.03.2018 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
22.03.2018 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
22.03.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
22.03.2018 Means of redress Search / examination 2
14.03.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.02.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.02.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 4
09.02.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
09.02.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.01.2017 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.06.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
08.06.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.05.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 44
13.05.2016 Description Search / examination 44
13.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.05.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.04.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
22.02.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.02.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.08.2015 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
11.08.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
07.08.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
07.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.08.2015 Request for further processing Search / examination 3
12.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
12.03.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.03.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
05.03.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.02.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
12.11.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
12.11.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
12.11.2014 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.11.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
10.11.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
10.11.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
18.06.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 2
28.04.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
17.04.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 8
16.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.04.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
26.03.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
26.03.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
28.02.2014 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
28.02.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
13.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
13.02.2014 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 4
13.02.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
17.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 55
14.03.2013 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 3
14.03.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
14.03.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 53
19.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
19.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 5
07.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
07.09.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
07.09.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
07.09.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 44
07.09.2012 Drawings PCT receiving Office 4
07.09.2012 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 54