blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2753168


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.12.2018 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.12.2018 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
23.11.2018 Change - divisional application(s) published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
21.11.2018 New entry: Observations by third parties
20.11.2018 New entry: Observations by third parties
16.11.2018 New entry: Observations by third parties
12.11.2018 New entry: Observations by third parties
09.11.2018 New entry: Observations by third parties
14.09.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.09.2018 New entry: Observations by third parties
24.08.2018 New entry: Observations by third parties
30.07.2018 New entry: Observations by third parties
29.07.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
27.04.2018 Change: Appeal number
06.04.2018 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
06.04.2018 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
06.04.2018 New entry: Appeal number
23.03.2018 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
10.03.2018 Change - representative
20.02.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.02.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.05.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.03.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.09.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.08.2015 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
11.08.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
11.08.2015 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
11.08.2015 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
10.08.2015 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
17.03.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.03.2015 First examination report
14.11.2014 Change - extension states published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
13.11.2014 Amendment by applicant
11.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.06.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.07.2014  [2014/29]
13.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  16.07.2014  [2014/29]
11.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
28.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
13.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.02.2014 New entry: Biological material
02.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
15.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
14.11.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication