blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2753168 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP11180586 EP12756468 EP18206785



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019014735Global Dossier 17.01.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201615285199 04.10.2016
WO2012EP67585 07.09.2012
EP11180586 08.09.2011
US201816131242 14.09.2018
US201414241613 01.04.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10104859Global Dossier 23.10.2018B2
US2017020096 26.01.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201615285199 04.10.2016
WO2012EP67585 07.09.2012
EP11180586 08.09.2011
US201414241613 01.04.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9493784Global Dossier 15.11.2016B2
US2014230102 14.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012EP67585 07.09.2012
EP11180586 08.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3491916Global Dossier 05.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
WO2012EP67585 07.09.2012
EP11180586 08.09.2011
EP12756468 07.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2753168Global Dossier 16.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012EP67585 07.09.2012
EP11180586 08.09.2011
EP12756468 07.09.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013034747Global Dossier 14.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP11180586 08.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2567611Global Dossier 13.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP11180586 08.09.2011
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3491916