Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2753168

EP2753168 - NEW PEPPER PLANTS AND FRUITS WITH IMPROVED NUTRITIONAL VALUE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Change - applicantpublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Syngenta Participations AG
Rosentalstrasse 67
4058 Basel / CH
[2019/44]
Former [2014/29]For all designated states
Syngenta Participations AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / BOYDEN, Laurie
Syngenta Seeds Inc.
Research
317 330th Street
Stanton, MN 55018 / US
02 / COOK, Kevin
Syngenta Seeds Inc.
R&D Naples
10290 Greenway Road
Naples, FL 34114 / US
03 / CZAPLEWSKI, Steven, John
Syngenta Seeds Inc.
R&D Naples
10290 Greenway Road
Naples, FL 34114 / US
04 / VAN WIJK, Henricus, Johannes
Syngenta Seeds S.A.S.
12 chemin de l'Hobit
BP 27
F-31790 Saint-Sauveur / FR
 [2014/29]
Representative(s)SYNGENTA IP
CHBS-B4.8
Rosentalstrasse 67
4058 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/29]Syngenta International AG
WRO-1008.Z1.26
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date12756468.007.09.2012
WO2012EP67585
Priority number, dateEP2011018058608.09.2011         Original published format: EP 11180586
[2014/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013034747
Date:14.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2753168
Date:16.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013
[2014/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:A01H5/08, C12N15/82, A01H1/04, C12Q1/68
[2014/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/29]
TitleGerman:NEUE PFEFFERPFLANZEN UND FRÜCHTE MIT VERBESSERTEM NÄHRWERT[2014/29]
English:NEW PEPPER PLANTS AND FRUITS WITH IMPROVED NUTRITIONAL VALUE[2014/29]
French:NOUVEAUX POIVRONS ET FRUITS DE MEILLEURE VALEUR NUTRITIONNELLE[2014/29]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase08.04.2014National basic fee paid 
08.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/29]
10.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
22.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
27.07.2018Observations by third parties
20.08.2018Observations by third parties
05.09.2018Observations by third parties
07.11.2018Observations by third parties
12.11.2018Observations by third parties
15.11.2018Observations by third parties
19.11.2018Observations by third parties
20.11.2018Observations by third parties
Appeal following examination05.04.2018Appeal received No.  T1063/18
05.04.2018Statement of grounds filed
05.12.2018Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
05.12.2018Date of oral proceedings
14.12.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP18206785.0  / EP3491916
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.03.2015
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
07.08.2015Request for further processing filed
07.08.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.08.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
10.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XY]  - Y Lee ET AL, "Flavonoids and antioxidant activity of fresh pepper (Capsicum annuum) cultivars", Journal of Food Science, vol. 60, (19950101), pages 473 - 476, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/store/10.1111/j.1365-2621.1995.tb09806.x/asset/j.1365-2621.1995.tb09806.x.pdf?v=1&t=gv25m0s9&s=9fd212ab7ad52fcd999b1885f797d9e4a6c6a251, (20111116), XP055012247 [X] 1-4 * Section: Materials * [Y] 5,6
 [XY]  - CAMARA B ET AL, "Free and esterified carotenoids in green and red fruits of Capsicum annuum", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, vol. 17, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0031-9422(00)89686-7, ISSN 0031-9422, (19780101), pages 91 - 93, (19780101), XP026632817 [X] 1-4 * page 92, column 2, line 36 - line 38; table 2 * [Y] 5,6

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-9422(00)89686-7
 [XY]  - MINGUEZ-MOSQUERA M ISABEL ET AL, "Formation and transformation of pigments during the fruit ripening of Capsicum annuum cv. Bola and Agridulce", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19940101), vol. 42, no. 1, doi:10.1021/JF00037A005, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 38 - 44, XP002447585 [X] 1-4 * tables 2,3 * [Y] 5,6

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf00037a005
 [XY]  - Ben A Chaim ET AL, "QTL mapping of fruit-related traits in pepper (Capsicum annuum)", Theoretical and Applied Genetics, vol. 102, doi:http://dx.doi.org/10.1007%2Fs001220000461, (20010101), pages 1016 - 1028, URL: http://www.springerlink.com/content/qfnbbj8rptr7bn8x/fulltext.pdf, (20111116), XP055012327 [X] 5 * page 1025, line 1 - line 6 * * page 1018 * [Y] 6

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/http://dx.doi.org/10.1007%2Fs001220000461
 [XP]  - BRAND A ET EL, "pc8.1, a major QTL for pigment content in pepper fruit, is associated with variation in plastid compartment size.", PLANTA, (20111011), XP002663704 [XP] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S00425-011-1530-9
 [A]  - HORNERO-MENDEZ D ET AL, "Carotenoid biosynthesis changes in five red pepper (Capsicum annuum L.) cultivars during ripening. Cultivar selection for breeding", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20000901), vol. 48, no. 9, doi:10.1021/JF991020R, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 3857 - 3864, XP002447582 [A] 1-6 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf991020r
 [A]  - G. J. LIGHTBOURN ET AL, "Effects of Anthocyanin and Carotenoid Combinations on Foliage and Immature Fruit Color of Capsicum annuum L.", JOURNAL OF HEREDITY, (20080124), vol. 99, no. 2, doi:10.1093/jhered/esm108, ISSN 0022-1503, pages 105 - 111, XP055012348 [A] 1-6 * table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jhered/esm108
 [A]  - JI-SUN KIM ET AL, "Phytochemicals and Antioxidant Activity of Fruits and Leaves of Paprika (Capsicum Annuum L., var. Special) Cultivated in Korea", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, (20110121), vol. 76, no. 2, doi:10.1111/j.1750-3841.2010.01891.x, ISSN 0022-1147, pages C193 - C198, XP055012349 [A] 1-6 * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1750-3841.2010.01891.x
 [A]  - YELENA BOROVSKY ET AL, "Chlorophyll breakdown during pepper fruit ripening in the chlorophyll retainer mutation is impaired at the homolog of the senescence-inducible stay-green gene", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS ; INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PLANT BREEDING RESEARCH, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20080422), vol. 117, no. 2, ISSN 1432-2242, pages 235 - 240, XP019618368 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
by applicant   - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADVANCES IN APPLIED MATHEMATICS, (1981), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489
    - W.R. PEARSON, METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, vol. 183, (1990), pages 63 - 98, URL: http://workbench.sdsc.edu