blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2753168 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2753168



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 965
26.09.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
18.02.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.02.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.02.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 29
05.02.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 29
05.02.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.02.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 1
23.01.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
14.12.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
10.12.2018 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Search / examination 4
28.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.11.2018 Observations by third parties Appeal 3
23.11.2018 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
22.11.2018 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
22.11.2018 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
20.11.2018 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
20.11.2018 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
20.11.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 13
19.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.11.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 5
15.11.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
14.11.2018 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
14.11.2018 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
13.11.2018 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
13.11.2018 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
12.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.11.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 6
07.11.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
26.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.10.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
26.10.2018 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
26.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
26.10.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
26.10.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 28
04.10.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 8
10.09.2018 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
10.09.2018 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
05.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.09.2018 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 12
05.09.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
27.08.2018 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
27.08.2018 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
20.08.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 5
20.08.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
13.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.08.2018 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
01.08.2018 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
30.07.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
30.07.2018 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
27.07.2018 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Appeal 40
27.07.2018 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Appeal 2
27.07.2018 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Appeal 131
27.07.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 13
27.07.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
25.07.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
21.06.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
20.06.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.05.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
02.05.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
23.04.2018 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
18.04.2018 Refund of fees Appeal 1
05.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.04.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 71
05.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
05.04.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
05.04.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 22
03.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.04.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.03.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
22.03.2018 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
22.03.2018 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
22.03.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
22.03.2018 Means of redress Search / examination 2
14.03.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.02.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.02.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 4
09.02.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
09.02.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.01.2017 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.06.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
08.06.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.05.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 44
13.05.2016 Description Search / examination 44
13.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.05.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.04.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
22.02.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.02.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.08.2015 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
11.08.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
07.08.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
07.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.08.2015 Request for further processing Search / examination 3
12.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
12.03.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.03.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
05.03.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.02.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
12.11.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
12.11.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
12.11.2014 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.11.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
10.11.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
10.11.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
18.06.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 2
28.04.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
17.04.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 8
16.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.04.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
26.03.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
26.03.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
28.02.2014 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
28.02.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
13.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
13.02.2014 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 4
13.02.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
17.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 55
14.03.2013 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 3
14.03.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
14.03.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 53
19.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
19.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 5
07.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
07.09.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
07.09.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
07.09.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 44
07.09.2012 Drawings PCT receiving Office 4
07.09.2012 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 54