Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2755503

EP2755503 - METHOD AND PLANT FOR PROCESSING WET OLIVE POMACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.10.2016
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019Change - classificationpublished on 13.02.2019  [2019/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEA Mechanical Equipment GmbH
Werner-Habig-Strasse 1
59302 Oelde / DE
[2014/30]
Inventor(s)01 / HRUSCHKA, Steffen
Aenne-Brauksiepe-Str. 7
59302 Oelde / DE
02 / CORREA, Tomás Ignacio Eguiguren
Camino Agua del Carrizal 9525
Lo Barnechea
Santiago de Chile / CL
03 / CORBELLA, José Alberto
Nva. Costanera 3148
Dp. 41
Vitacura
Santiago de Chile / CL
 [2014/30]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2014/30]
Application number, filing date12756483.911.09.2012
[2015/51]
WO2012EP67697
Priority number, dateDE2011105352712.09.2011         Original published format: DE102011053527
[2014/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013037751
Date:21.03.2013
Language:DE
[2013/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2755503
Date:23.07.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013
[2014/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2755503
Date:16.12.2015
Language:DE
[2015/51]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP2755503
Date:07.03.2018
[2018/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/212, A23L3/3454, C07B63/00, B30B9/00, B30B9/02
[2014/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR AUFARBEITUNG VON ALPEORUJO[2014/30]
English:METHOD AND PLANT FOR PROCESSING WET OLIVE POMACE[2014/30]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT DE GRIGNONS PÂTEUX D'OLIVE[2014/30]
Entry into regional phase01.04.2014National basic fee paid 
01.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/30]
24.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.10.2015Fee for grant paid
23.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
30.11.2017Request for correction of the decision to grant filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.07.2015
Opposition(s)19.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.09.2012
AL16.12.2015
BG16.12.2015
CY16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MK16.12.2015
MT16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
GB11.09.2016
IE11.09.2016
LU11.09.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU11.09.2012
BG16.12.2015
CY16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MK16.12.2015
MT16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
GB11.09.2016
IE11.09.2016
LU11.09.2016
Former [2018/31]HU11.09.2012
CY16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MK16.12.2015
MT16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
GB11.09.2016
IE11.09.2016
LU11.09.2016
Former [2018/28]HU11.09.2012
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MK16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
GB11.09.2016
IE11.09.2016
LU11.09.2016
Former [2017/41]CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
GB11.09.2016
IE11.09.2016
LU11.09.2016
Former [2017/31]CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2017/16]CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2016/49]CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2016/46]CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2016/38]CZ16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
Former [2016/26]FI16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
Former [2016/25]FI16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
Former [2016/23]LT16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
Former [2016/21]LT16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
Former [2016/20]LT16.12.2015
Cited inInternational search[XDYI]WO2007042742  (ZUMBE ALBERT [GB]) [XD] 1,3,4,6,12-14,24 * the whole document * [Y] 1-24 [I] 1-24;
 [X]WO2006005986  (NATRACEUTICAL SA [ES], et al) [X] 24 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005021695  (SUED CHEMIE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-24 * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 17, paragraph 1; claims 1-20 *;
 [A]WO2004110171  (NATRACEUTICAL SA [ES], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - ALBURQUERQUE J A ET AL, "Effects of bulking agent on the composting of ''alperujo'', the solid by-product of the two-phase centrifugation method for olive oil extraction", PROCESS BIOCHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 41, no. 1, ISSN 1359-5113, (20060101), pages 127 - 132, (20060101), XP027983960 [Y] 1-24 * the whole document *
 [A]  - J ALBURQUERQUE, "Agrochemical characterisation of "alperujo", a solid by-product of the two-phase centrifugation method for olive oil extraction", BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (20040101), vol. 91, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0960-8524(03)00177-9, ISSN 0960-8524, pages 195 - 200, XP055042054 [A] 1-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-8524(03)00177-9
by applicantDE4206006
 EP1260571
 EP0557758
 EP0718397
 WO2007042742
 WO2007118920