Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2755800

EP2755800 - DEVICE FOR SPRAYING DRY ICE, PARTICULARLY FROZEN CARBON DIOXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/30]DEVICE FOR SPRAYING DRY ICE, PARTICULARLY FROZEN CARBON DIOXIDE, AND NOZZLE FOR SAID DEVICE
[2015/51]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude
75 quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
[2014/30]
Inventor(s)01 / GOMEZ, Philippe
43 boulevard Charles Vaillant
F-93290 Tremblay-en-France / FR
 [2014/30]
Representative(s)Mellul-Bendelac, Sylvie Lisette
L'Air Liquide
Direction des Services
De la Propriété Intellectuelle
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[2016/19]
Former [2014/30]Mellul-Bendelac, Sylvie Lisette
L'Air Liquide
Service Propriété Industrielle
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date12756772.508.08.2012
[2016/19]
WO2012FR51870
Priority number, dateFR2011005810513.09.2011         Original published format: FR 1158105
[2014/30]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013038084
Date:21.03.2013
Language:FR
[2013/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2755800
Date:23.07.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013
[2014/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2755800
Date:11.05.2016
Language:FR
[2016/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:B24C1/00
[2014/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM STRAHLEN VON TROCKENEIS, INSBESONDERE KARBONISCHES TROCKENEIS[2015/51]
English:DEVICE FOR SPRAYING DRY ICE, PARTICULARLY FROZEN CARBON DIOXIDE[2015/51]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PROJECTION DE GLACE SÈCHE, NOTAMMENT DE GLACE CARBONIQUE[2015/51]
Former [2014/30]VORRICHTUNG ZUM SPRÜHEN VON TROCKENEIS, INSBESONDERE VON GEFRORENEM KOHLENDIOXID, UND DÜSE FÜR DIESE VORRICHTUNG
Former [2014/30]DEVICE FOR SPRAYING DRY ICE, PARTICULARLY FROZEN CARBON DIOXIDE, AND NOZZLE FOR SAID DEVICE
Former [2014/30]DISPOSITIF DE PROJECTION DE GLACE SÈCHE, NOTAMMENT DE GLACE CARBONIQUE, ET BUSE POUR UN TEL DISPOSITIF
Entry into regional phase14.04.2014National basic fee paid 
14.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/30]
22.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2016Fee for grant paid
22.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.02.2015
Opposition(s)14.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.08.2012
AL11.05.2016
AT11.05.2016
BG11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IS11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
MK11.05.2016
MT11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
TR11.05.2016
IE08.08.2016
LU08.08.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU08.08.2012
AT11.05.2016
BG11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IS11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
MK11.05.2016
MT11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
TR11.05.2016
IE08.08.2016
LU08.08.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2018/38]HU08.08.2012
AT11.05.2016
BG11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IS11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
MK11.05.2016
MT11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
IE08.08.2016
LU08.08.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2018/31]HU08.08.2012
AT11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IS11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
MK11.05.2016
MT11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
IE08.08.2016
LU08.08.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2018/28]HU08.08.2012
AT11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
MK11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
IE08.08.2016
LU08.08.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/37]AT11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
IE08.08.2016
LU08.08.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/23]AT11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/17]AT11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/03]FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9807548  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE102004023246  (KIPP JENS-WERNER [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraph [0021] *;
 [Y]DE102005021999  (KIPP JENS WERNER [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraph [0002]; figure - *;
 [Y]DE102005002365  (AIR LIQUIDE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraph [0042]; figure - *;
 [A]DE102006023709  (BUSE GASTEK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE102004051005  (KIPP JENS WERNER [DE]) [AD] 1,2 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1765551
 DE102005021999