Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2700406

EP2700406 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING INDIGO-PLANT LEAF EXTRACT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/09]METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYGONUM TINCTORIUM EXTRACT& xA;
[2017/31]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.07.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC, SI
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sunstar Inc.
3-1 Asahi-machi Takatsuki-shi
Osaka 569-1195 / JP
[2014/09]
Inventor(s)01 / KUSAKARI, Takashi
c/o SUNSTAR INC.
3-1 Asahimachi
Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1195 / JP
02 / YAMASHITA, Kentaro
c/o SUNSTAR INC.
3-1 Asahimachi
Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1195 / JP
 [2014/09]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2017/41]
Former [2014/09]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date12757148.714.03.2012
[2017/41]
WO2012JP56598
Priority number, dateJP2011005594214.03.2011         Original published format: JP 2011055942
[2014/09]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012124743
Date:20.09.2012
Language:JA
[2012/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2700406
Date:26.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2700406
Date:11.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.09.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/97, A61K36/704, A61K31/519, A61Q17/00, A61Q19/00, A61P17/00, A61P31/10, A61K8/49
[2017/29]
Former International [2014/43]A61K36/00, A61K8/97, A61K31/502, A61P17/00, A61P31/10, A61P37/08, A61Q17/04, A61Q19/00, A61Q19/10, A61K8/49, A61K31/519, A61K36/704
Former International [2014/09]A61K36/00, A61K8/97, A61K31/502, A61P17/00, A61P31/10, A61P37/08, A61Q17/04, A61Q19/00, A61Q19/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES EXTRAKTES AUS BLÄTTER DER INDIGO-PFLANZE[2017/40]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING INDIGO-PLANT LEAF EXTRACT[2017/40]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN EXTRAIT DE FEUILLES DE PLANTE D'INDIGO[2017/40]
Former [2014/09]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES POLYGONUM-TINCTORIUM-EXTRAKTS
Former [2014/09]METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYGONUM TINCTORIUM EXTRACT& xA;
Former [2014/09]PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN EXTRAIT DE POLYGONUM TINCTORIUM
Entry into regional phase21.08.2013Translation filed 
29.08.2013National basic fee paid 
29.08.2013Search fee paid 
29.08.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
29.08.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.08.2013Examination requested  [2014/09]
01.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
24.08.2017Fee for grant paid
24.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.01.2016
Opposition(s)12.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MC11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
[2018/52]
Former [2018/40]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/22]FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
NO11.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL11.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2009149596  ;
 [X]EP1894558  (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP]) [X] 1-8 * see claims, examples 1-3 and 6-10, experiments 1-10 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 48, Database accession no. 2009-L45693, XP002729472 & JP2009149596 A 20090709 (RANSHOKU KOBO YG) [X] 1,7,8 * abstract *
International search[X]JP2005281253  (NOF CORP, et al);
 [X]JP2001031581  (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB)
by applicantJP2004189732
 JP2006241080