Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783226

EP2783226 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TESTING THE INTERCONNECTION OF PHOTOVOLTAIC CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.09.2017  [2017/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO
Anna van Buerenplein 1
2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL
[2015/17]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast-natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
Inventor(s)01 / DOODEMAN, Gerardus, Johannes, Nicolaas
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
NL-2628 VK Delft / NL
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12758661.803.09.2012
WO2012NL50608
Priority number, dateEP2011017974901.09.2011         Original published format: EP 11179749
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013032339
Date:07.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783226
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/26, G01R33/02, G01R33/04, G01R33/06
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR PRÜFUNG DER VERNETZUNG VON PHOTOVOLTAIKZELLEN[2014/40]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TESTING THE INTERCONNECTION OF PHOTOVOLTAIC CELLS[2014/40]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE CONTRÔLE D'INTERCONNEXION DE CELLULES PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase11.03.2014National basic fee paid 
11.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
17.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/36]
28.04.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0604810  (ALCATEL STANDARD ELECTRICA [ES]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 19; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US3621382  (VALET JEAN-YVES) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * column 3, line 4 - column 8, line 22; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]EP1526645  (TURCK WERNER KG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph [0016] - page 5, paragraph [0026]; figures 1-10 *;
 [A]US4130242  (MANNION ROBERT S) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 33 - column 5, line 60; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]GB2425610  (UNIV LONDON [GB]; UNIV HOUSTON [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 7, line 26 - page 9, line 12; figures 1-3 *;
 [AD]JP2003110122  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [AD] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [AD]WO2008017305  (SOLARWATT AG [DE]; KUENANZ STEFFEN [DE]; MUENCH MARKUS [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2008146184  (NXP BV [NL]; BUTZMANN STEFAN [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * figure 8 *;
 [A]WO2010082115  (SENECA S R L [IT]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 7, line 15 - page 12, line 15; figures 1-7 *
 [X]  - ROVATI L ET AL, "Closed loop PCB Fluxgate without compensation coil", SENSORS, 2007 IEEE, IEEE, PI, (20071028), ISBN 978-1-4244-1261-7, pages 852 - 855, XP031221195 [X] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [X]  - S. MIDDELHOEK, "Magnetic Field Measurement. November 1961.", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, New York, US, (19611101), vol. 4, no. 6, pages 42 - 43, XP002672168 [X] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [X]  - KEJK P ET AL, "A new compact 2D planar fluxgate sensor with amorphous metal core", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (20000401), vol. 81, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/S0924-4247(99)00083-7, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 180 - 183, XP004191281 [X] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-4247(99)00083-7
 [X]  - RIPKA P ET AL, "A.c. magnetic-field measurement using the fluxgate", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 46, no. 1-3, ISSN 0924-4247, (19950101), pages 307 - 311, (19950101), XP027205950 [X] 1-13 * the whole document *
by applicantDE4440167
 WO2008017305
 JP2003110122
 EP0604810