Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2751051

EP2751051 - RAMMING MASS FOR THE REFRACTORY LINING OF A METALLURGICAL VESSEL, METALLURGICAL VESSEL, SUCH AS BLAST FURNACE, INCLUDING A LINING USING SAID RAMMING MASS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/28]RAMMING MASS FOR THE REFRACTORY COATING OF A METALLURGICAL VESSEL, METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME AND METALLURGICAL VESSEL, IN PARTICULAR A BLAST FURNACE, COMPRISING A COATING USING SAID RAMMING MASS
[2016/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Paul Wurth S.A.
32, rue d'Alsace
1122 Luxembourg / LU
[2016/27]
Former [2014/28]For all designated states
Paul Wurth S.A.
32rue d'Alsace
1122 Luxembourg / LU
Inventor(s)01 / PIRET, Jacques
61 Quai de Rome
B-4000 Liège / BE
 [2014/28]
Representative(s)Office Freylinger
P.O. Box 48
8001 Strassen / LU
[2014/28]
Application number, filing date12759077.605.09.2012
[2016/27]
WO2012EP67344
Priority number, dateLU2011009186809.09.2011         Original published format: LU 91868
[2014/28]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013034605
Date:14.03.2013
Language:FR
[2013/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2751051
Date:09.07.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013
[2014/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2751051
Date:06.07.2016
Language:FR
[2016/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/66, C21B7/06
[2014/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STOPFMASSE FÜR DIE FEUERFESTE AUSKLEIDUNG EINES METALLURGISCHEN GEFÄSSES, METALLURGISCHES GEFÄSS, BEISPIELSWEISE EIN HOCHOFEN, DAS EINE AUSKLEIDUNG UMFASST, DIE DIE GENANNTE STOPFMASSE VERWENDET[2016/15]
English:RAMMING MASS FOR THE REFRACTORY LINING OF A METALLURGICAL VESSEL, METALLURGICAL VESSEL, SUCH AS BLAST FURNACE, INCLUDING A LINING USING SAID RAMMING MASS[2016/15]
French:MASSE À DAMER POUR LE REVÊTEMENT RÉFRACTAIRE D'UN RÉCIPIENT MÉTALLURGIQUE, PROCÉDÉ POUR SA MISE EN UVRE ET RÉCIPIENT MÉTALLURGIQUE, NOTAMMENT HAUT-FOURNEAU, COMPORTANT UN REVÊTEMENT UTILISANT LA DITE MASSE À DAMER[2014/28]
Former [2014/28]STAMPFMASSE ZUR FEUERFESTEN BESCHICHTUNG EINES METALLURGISCHEN GEFÄSSES, UMSETZUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND METALLURGISCHES GEFÄSS, INSBESONDERE HOCHÖFEN, MIT EINER BESCHICHTUNG MIT DIESER STAMPFMASSE
Former [2014/28]RAMMING MASS FOR THE REFRACTORY COATING OF A METALLURGICAL VESSEL, METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME AND METALLURGICAL VESSEL, IN PARTICULAR A BLAST FURNACE, COMPRISING A COATING USING SAID RAMMING MASS
Entry into regional phase26.02.2014National basic fee paid 
26.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/28]
25.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.05.2016Fee for grant paid
26.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.03.2015
Opposition(s)07.04.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.09.2012
AL06.07.2016
CY06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
MK06.07.2016
MT06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
TR06.07.2016
IE05.09.2016
LU05.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
FR30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU05.09.2012
CY06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
MK06.07.2016
MT06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
TR06.07.2016
IE05.09.2016
LU05.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
FR30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2018/31]HU05.09.2012
CY06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
MK06.07.2016
MT06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
IE05.09.2016
LU05.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
FR30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2018/28]HU05.09.2012
CY06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
MK06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
IE05.09.2016
LU05.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
FR30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/41]CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
IE05.09.2016
LU05.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
FR30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
IE05.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
FR30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/35]CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
IE05.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
FR30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/34]CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
IE05.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
FR30.09.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/32]CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
IE05.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/31]CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BE30.09.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/13]ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
BE30.09.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/11]ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
BE30.09.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/10]FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
BE30.09.2016
NO06.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
NO06.10.2016
Former [2017/07]LT06.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]FR2444716  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-16 * page 2, line 6 - line 7 * * page 4, line 29 - line 36 * * page 5, line 19 - line 28 * * page 8, line 1 - line 17 *;
 [A]EP0500061  (UCAR CARBON TECH [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 4, line 19 - line 21 *;
 [A]LU48404  (FARBWERKE HOECHST AG) [A] 1-16 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 1; claim 1 *
by applicantJP2002121080
 CN1544389
 CN1690012
 CN101823891