blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2739826 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2739826



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 478
16.02.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
13.04.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
16.03.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.03.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.11.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
14.11.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.11.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.11.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
14.11.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 36
17.10.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
06.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
06.09.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
06.09.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
06.09.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
06.09.2016 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
06.09.2016 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
02.09.2016 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
31.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
31.08.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
31.08.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
31.08.2016 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
31.08.2016 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
31.08.2016 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
18.05.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
18.05.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
18.05.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
18.05.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
18.05.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 36
22.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
22.04.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
22.04.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
22.04.2016 Description Search / examination 5
22.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.04.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.04.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
14.04.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
14.04.2016 Description Search / examination 4
14.04.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.12.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.12.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.10.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
18.09.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
18.09.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
23.07.2015 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
18.05.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
18.05.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.05.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
27.03.2015 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 2
15.03.2015 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
21.01.2015 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
10.12.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
05.06.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
03.06.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
14.05.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
14.05.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
14.05.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.03.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
01.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
01.03.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 10
26.02.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
26.02.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
26.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
26.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
26.02.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
26.02.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 9
26.02.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 10
25.02.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
25.02.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 10
18.02.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
11.12.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.07.2013 Republication of A1/A2 Pamphlet -amended claims and/or statement Search / examination 7
10.05.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
10.05.2013 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
07.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
07.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
07.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
26.02.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
07.02.2013 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 38
02.01.2013 Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
14.09.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
14.09.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 4
14.09.2012 Description International Searching Authority 18
14.09.2012 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
14.09.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 15