blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2739826


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019 [2019/30]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
16.02.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
10.03.2017 Deletion: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
10.03.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
10.03.2017 (Expected) grant published on  12.04.2017  [2017/15]
08.03.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
13.11.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.10.2016 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.10.2016 Deletion: Payment of fee for grant
10.10.2016 Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
04.10.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
04.10.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.09.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
09.09.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
03.09.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
17.05.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.04.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.01.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.09.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.08.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.05.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.05.2015 First examination report
03.12.2014 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
03.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.10.2014 Change - extension states published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
30.08.2014 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
30.05.2014 Change - applicant published on  02.07.2014  [2014/27]
09.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.05.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.06.2014  [2014/24]
09.05.2014 Request for examination filed published on  11.06.2014  [2014/24]
06.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.03.2014 Amendment by applicant
07.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
07.03.2014 Amendment by applicant
04.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.03.2014 Amendment by applicant
11.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
18.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
28.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication