blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2739826
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9243617Global Dossier 26.01.2016B2
US2014150643 05.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
BG11100711 02.08.2011
WO2012BG00018 30.07.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2842389Global Dossier 19.12.2017C
CA2842389 07.02.2013A1
Priority number Date
BG11100711 02.08.2011
WO2012BG00018 30.07.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2739826Global Dossier 12.04.2017B1
EP2739826 11.06.2014A2
Priority number Date
BG11100711 02.08.2011
WO2012BG00018 30.07.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013016780Global Dossier 11.07.2013A4
WO2013016780 10.05.2013A3
WO2013016780 07.02.2013A2
Priority number Date
BG11100711 02.08.2011