Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2739826

EP2739826 - CAM ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bahnev, Boyan Kirilov
808- 10615 47 Ave NW
Edmonton AB T6H 0B2 / CA
[2014/27]
Former [2014/24]For all designated states
Bahnev, Boyan Kirilov
40, Kapitan Raytcho Str.
4000 Plovdiv / BG
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/24]
Representative(s)Shentova, Violeta Varbanova
11, Damyan Gruev Street
1606 Sofia / BG
[2014/24]
Application number, filing date12759623.730.07.2012
[2017/15]
WO2012BG00018
Priority number, dateBG2011011100702.08.2011         Original published format: BG 11100711
[2014/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013016780
Date:07.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/06]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2739826
Date:11.06.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2013
[2014/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2739826
Date:12.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:F01B9/06, F01B3/04, F02B75/26
[2014/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:NOCKENMOTOR[2014/24]
English:CAM ENGINE[2014/24]
French:MOTEUR À CAMES[2014/24]
Entry into regional phase28.02.2014National basic fee paid 
28.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/24]
18.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
07.09.2016Fee for grant paid
07.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2015
Opposition(s)15.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201403   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2014
31.07.201605   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2016
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IE30.07.2017
LU30.07.2017
MT30.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
[2019/30]
Former [2018/43]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IE30.07.2017
LU30.07.2017
MT30.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/39]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IE30.07.2017
LU30.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/34]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IE30.07.2017
LU30.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/25]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/21]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL12.04.2017
Cited inInternational search[DY]WO2007036007  (BAHNEV BOYAN KIRILOV [BG]) [DY] 1-21 * page 11, line 5 - line 7; figures 8a,8b *;
 [Y]US2243821  (HERRMANN KARL L) [Y] 1-21 * page 2, column 1, line 43 - line 52 * * column 2, line 68 - line 74 *;
 [Y]US2664866  (FULKE FRANK L) [Y] 1-21 * column 9, line 4 - line 9 *;
 [A]GB485169  (GEORGE STANLEY EDLIN, et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 75 - line 84 * * page 2, line 12 - line 17 *;
 [A]DE3301271  (SCHWANT WILFRIED) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantEP1937938
 EP1937993