EP2755472 - USE OF CYPROSULFAMIDE FOR IMPROVING PLANT YIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/30] | USE OF ACYLSULFONAMIDES FOR IMPROVING PLANT YIELD | ||
[2016/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | [2014/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HACKER, Erwin, Dr. Bitzestraße 16 88515 Langenenslingen / DE | 02 /
BONFIG-PICARD, Georg, Dr. Landwehr 29 63517 Rodenbach / DE | 03 /
LEHR, Stefan, Dr. Rue Bugeaud 9 69006 Lyon / FR | 04 /
BICKERS, Udo, Dr. Paradiesweg 36a 65779 Kelkheim, Ts. / DE | 05 /
HESS, Martin, Dr. Buchenweg 83 55128 Mainz / DE | 06 /
TRABOLD, Klaus Maaßstraße 23 69123 Heidelberg / DE | 07 /
SCHMIDT, Mathias Wüstemser Weg 11 65529 Waldems / DE | 08 /
ZIEMER, Frank, Dr. Uhlandstraße 2 65830 Kriftel / DE | 09 /
RUIZ-SANTAELLA MORENO, Juan Pedro, Dr. Schinkelstraße 8 40789 Monheim / DE | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/35] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2014/30] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 12759703.7 | 14.09.2012 | [2016/35] | WO2012EP68096 | Priority number, date | EP20110181702 | 16.09.2011 Original published format: EP 11181702 | [2014/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013037955 | Date: | 21.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2755472 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2755472 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01N39/04, C07C311/38, C07D405/06, A01N25/00, A01N41/06, A01N43/653 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
A01N25/00 (EP,US);
C07C311/38 (US);
A01N39/04 (EP,US);
A01N41/06 (EP,US);
A01N43/653 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
Y02A40/10 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N25/00, A01N41/06 (US,EP);
A01N39/04, A01N39/04, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N41/06, A01N37/50, A01N39/04, A01N43/653, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/653, A01N37/50, A01N43/653, A01N2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2014/30] | A01N25/00, A01N41/06, A01N43/653, A01N37/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON CYPROSULFAMID ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES PFLANZENERTRAGS | [2016/25] | English: | USE OF CYPROSULFAMIDE FOR IMPROVING PLANT YIELD | [2016/25] | French: | UTILISATION DE CYPROSULFAMIDE POUR AMÉLIORER LE RENDEMENT DES PLANTES | [2016/25] |
Former [2014/30] | VERWENDUNG VON ACYLSULFONAMIDEN ZUR VERBESSERUNG EINES PFLANZENERTRAGS | ||
Former [2014/30] | USE OF ACYLSULFONAMIDES FOR IMPROVING PLANT YIELD | ||
Former [2014/30] | UTILISATION D'ACYLSULFONAMIDES POUR AMÉLIORER LE RENDEMENT DE VÉGÉTAUX | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 14.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.09.2012 | AL | 31.08.2016 | AT | 31.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CY | 31.08.2016 | CZ | 31.08.2016 | DK | 31.08.2016 | EE | 31.08.2016 | ES | 31.08.2016 | FI | 31.08.2016 | HR | 31.08.2016 | IS | 31.08.2016 | IT | 31.08.2016 | LT | 31.08.2016 | LV | 31.08.2016 | MC | 31.08.2016 | MK | 31.08.2016 | NL | 31.08.2016 | PL | 31.08.2016 | RO | 31.08.2016 | RS | 31.08.2016 | SE | 31.08.2016 | SI | 31.08.2016 | SK | 31.08.2016 | SM | 31.08.2016 | TR | 31.08.2016 | IE | 14.09.2016 | LU | 14.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | MT | 30.09.2016 | BG | 30.11.2016 | GB | 30.11.2016 | NO | 30.11.2016 | GR | 01.12.2016 | PT | 02.01.2017 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 14.09.2012 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IS | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
TR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GB | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 14.09.2012 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IS | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GB | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.09.2012 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GB | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GB | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 31.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3281233 (HOLMSEN THEODORE W) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 16 - line 29; example -; claim - * * column 3, line 1 - line 13 *; | [I]DE102006037120 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0037] , [0038]; example -; claim - *; | [A]DE102007045920 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) [A] 1-20* example -; claim - *; | [XD]EP2145537 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) [XD] 1-16,18 * paragraphs [0012] - [0017] - [0022] - [0024] - [0033] , [0079]; examples 1,2; claim - *; | [XDI]US2010267566 (SCHULZ ARNO [DE], et al) [XD] 1,2,6-16 * paragraphs [0060] - [0119] - [0267] , [0271]; claims 10-14 * [I] 1-20; | [A]WO2011006603 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * example -; claim - * | by applicant | US2289060 | DE1905834 | DE2906507 | EP0030287 | EP0086750 | EP0094349 | DE3335514 | JPS6087254 | EP0174562 | EP0191736 | EP0268554 | EP0269806 | US4761373 | EP0333131 | WO8910396 | EP0346620 | EP0365484 | EP0407798 | EP0407762 | WO9102069 | US5013659 | WO9107874 | WO9108202 | US5084082 | WO9205251 | US5123951 | EP0492366 | US5141870 | DE4128828 | US5198599 | EP0539588 | EP0571427 | US5273894 | US5276268 | EP0582198 | WO9404693 | US5304732 | WO9409144 | WO9411520 | EP0600983 | US5331107 | EP0607730 | EP0609013 | EP0609022 | WO9421795 | US5378824 | WO9504826 | WO9507897 | WO9509910 | US5434283 | EP0663956 | WO9526407 | US5463175 | WO9531553 | WO9535026 | WO9601904 | EP0709000 | WO9615248 | WO9619581 | EP0719338 | WO9621023 | EP0728213 | WO9627674 | US5561236 | WO9633270 | WO9634968 | WO9638567 | US5605011 | WO9711188 | US5637489 | WO9720936 | US5646024 | US5648477 | WO9726362 | WO9732985 | WO9741218 | WO9742328 | WO9744472 | WO9745016 | WO9745545 | WO9747806 | WO9747807 | WO9747808 | WO9800549 | US5712107 | DE19631764 | US5731180 | WO9813361 | US5739082 | EP0837944 | WO9820145 | WO9822604 | US5767361 | WO9827212 | WO9827049 | US5773702 | WO9827806 | US5776760 | WO9832326 | WO9839460 | WO9838856 | WO9840503 | WO9844140 | US5824790 | US5840946 | WO9900020 | WO9912950 | WO9916744 | WO9924585 | WO9924586 | WO9924593 | US5908810 | US5908975 | WO9934008 | US5928937 | US5965755 | US5969169 | WO9953072 | WO9957965 | WO9958688 | WO9958690 | WO9958654 | WO9966050 | US6013861 | WO0004173 | WO0008184 | WO0008185 | WO0011192 | WO0014249 | WO0022140 | WO0026345 | WO0026356 | US6063947 | WO0028052 | WO0047727 | WO0066746 | WO0066747 | WO0073422 | WO0077229 | US6169190 | WO0112782 | WO0112826 | WO0114569 | WO0117333 | WO0119975 | WO0124615 | WO0131042 | US6229072 | WO0141558 | WO0151654 | US6270828 | US6284479 | WO0166704 | WO0165922 | US2001029014 | US6323392 | WO0198509 | US2002031826 | WO0226995 | WO0234923 | WO0234946 | WO0234048 | WO0236782 | WO0236787 | WO0236831 | WO0244407 | WO0246387 | WO0245485 | US2002102582 | US2002120964 | WO02079410 | US6468747 | WO02101059 | WO02100163 | WO03013226 | WO03013224 | WO03033540 | US2003097687 | WO03052073 | US2003126634 | WO03071860 | US2003188347 | WO03092360 | WO03106457 | WO2004011601 | WO2004024928 | US6734341 | WO2004040012 | WO2004039986 | WO2004053219 | WO2004053062 | WO2004056999 | US6768044 | WO2004072235 | US2004172669 | WO2004074492 | WO2004078983 | WO2004084631 | WO2004090140 | WO2004099447 | WO2004099160 | WO2004106529 | US2004250317 | WO2005001117 | WO2005002324 | WO2005002359 | WO2005012515 | WO2005012529 | US2005039226 | WO2005017157 | WO2005015994 | WO2005016001 | WO2005020673 | WO2005030942 | WO2005030941 | US2005086719 | WO2005035486 | WO2005054479 | WO2005054480 | WO2005059103 | WO2005061720 | WO2005063094 | US2005188434 | WO2005077934 | WO2005085216 | US2005216969 | WO2005093093 | WO2005095632 | WO2005095617 | WO2005095619 | WO2005095618 | WO2005103266 | WO2005103301 | WO2005112630 | WO2005123927 | WO2006007373 | WO2006015376 | WO2006018319 | WO2006021972 | WO2006024351 | US2006059581 | US2006059590 | WO2006032538 | US2006070139 | WO2006043635 | US2006095986 | WO2006056433 | WO2006060634 | US2006130175 | WO2006063862 | WO2006072603 | US2006162007 | WO2006098952 | US7112665 | WO2006100288 | WO2006103107 | US2006230473 | WO2006108702 | WO2006108674 | WO2006108675 | JP2006304779 | WO2006129204 | WO2006128569 | WO2006128570 | WO2006128573 | WO2006128571 | WO2006128572 | WO2006130436 | WO2006128568 | WO2006129714 | US2006282915 | WO2006133827 | WO2006136351 | WO2007009823 | US2007028322 | WO2007017186 | WO2007024782 | WO2007023719 | WO2007023764 | WO2007027777 | US2007067868 | WO2007035650 | WO2007039314 | WO2007039315 | WO2007039316 | WO2007040280 | WO2007043677 | WO2007057407 | WO2007062737 | US2007143876 | WO2007074405 | WO2007075459 | WO2007080126 | WO2007080127 | WO2007091277 | WO2007107302 | WO2007115644 | WO2007115643 | WO2007115646 | WO2007140256 | WO2007142840 | US2007292854 | WO2007149134 | WO2008002872 | US2008028482 | US2008064032 | US2008070260 | WO2008054747 | JP2008110953 | US2008167456 | WO2008092615 | US2008196127 | WO2008104503 | WO2008112019 | WO2008114282 | WO2008122406 | US2008260932 | WO2008131854 | WO2008131861 | WO2008131860 | EP1999141 | US2008312082 | WO2008151780 | US2008320616 | WO2009049851 | US2009130071 | WO2009064652 | US2009137395 | WO2009068313 | WO2009100188 | US2009210970 | WO2009103049 | WO2009102873 | US2009217423 | WO2009111263 | US2009265817 | WO2009144079 | US2009300784 | WO2010003444 | WO2010006732 | US2010024077 | JP2010018586 | WO2010017956 | US2010050282 | WO2010024976 | US2010077501 | US2010080887 | WO2010037016 | WO2010077816 | WO2010076212 | WO2010080829 | US2010184079 | WO2010085705 | WO2010117737 | WO2010117735 | WO2010122956 | EP2248421 | WO2011022469 | US2011067141 | WO2011034704 | WO2011062904 | WO2011066384 | WO2011066360 | WO2011068567 | US2011138504 | WO2011075593 | WO2011075595 | WO2011076877 | WO2011076882 | WO2011076892 | WO2011076885 | WO2011076889 | WO2011084632 | WO2011084621 | - Biochemistry & Molecular Biology of the Plant, (2000), pages 558 - 562,850- | - Biochemistry & Molecular Biology of the Plant, (2000), pages 558 - 560 | - Biochemistry & Molecular Biology of the Plant, (2000), pages 542 - 565,980- | - MORGAN, ANNU. REV. CELL. DEV. BIOL., (1997), vol. 13, pages 261 - 291 | - AMON ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 74, pages 993 - 1007 | - DYNLACHT ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 389, pages 149 - 152 | - HUNT; NASMYTH, CURR. OPIN. CELL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 9, pages 765 - 767 | - THOMAS; HALL, CURR. OPIN. CELL BIOL., (1997), vol. 9, pages 782 - 787 | - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT, (1987), vol. 10, pages 323 - 431 | - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, (1987), vol. A 10, pages 363 - 401 | - COMAI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1983), vol. 221, pages 370 - 371 | - BARRY ET AL., CURR. TOPICS PLANT PHYSIOL., (1992), vol. 7, pages 139 - 145 | - SHAH ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 233, pages 478 - 481 | - GASSER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1988), vol. 263, pages 4280 - 4289 | - TRANEL; WRIGHT, WEED SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 50, pages 700 - 712 | - CRICKMORE ET AL., MICROBIOLOGY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY REVIEWS, (1998), vol. 62, pages 807 - 813 | - MOELLENBECK ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2001), vol. 19, pages 668 - 72 | - SCHNEPF ET AL., APPLIED ENVIRONM. MICROB., (2006), vol. 71, pages 1765 - 1774 | - R. WEGLER, Chemie der Pflanzenschutz- und Schädlingsbekämpfungsmittel, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1970), vol. 2, pages 401 - 412 | - BIOTECHN. ADV., (2006), vol. 24, pages 357 - 367 | - BOT. BULL. ACAD. SIN., vol. 199, no. 40, pages 1 - 7 | - PLANT GROWTH REG., (1993), vol. 13, pages 41 - 46 | - WEED RESEARCH, (1986), vol. 26, pages 441 - 445 | US20030739610 | US20040782020 | US20040783417 | US20040782096 | US20040926819 | US20050185342 | US20050185560 | US20050312866 | US20050315678 | US20060396808 | US20060400598 | US20060517991 | US20060588811 | US20060605824 | US20070651752 | US20070657964 | US20070681285 | WO2007EP02433 | US20070760570 | US20070760602 | US20070762526 | US20070762886 | US20070763947 | US20070765491 | US20070765494 | US20070769327 | US20070769255 | US20070943801 | US20080020360 | US20080032479 | US20080139408 | US20080166253 | US20080166239 | US20080166124 | US20080166209 | US20080135230 | US20080192904 | US20080209354 | US20080249016 | US20080252453 | US20090352532 | US20090362774 | US20090364335 | US20090364724 | US20090421292 | US20090423926 | US20090468205 | US20090491396 | US20090497221 | US20090288958 | US20100668303 |