Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2758832

EP2758832 - FLEXIBLE TRANSPARENT ELECTROCHOMIC DEVICE, AND A METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hydro-Québec
75 Boulevard René-Lévesque Ouest
Montréal QC H2Z 1A4 / CA
For all designated states
Fraunhofer Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27 c
80686 München / DE
For all designated states
Consorzio Interuniversitario Nazionale per la Scienza e Tecnologia dei Materiali (INSTM)
Via G. Giusti 9
50121 Firenze / IT
For all designated states
Università degli Studi di Milano - Bicocca
Piazza dell'Ateneo Nuovo, 1
20126 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2014/31]For all designated states
Hydro-Quebec
75 Boul. René-Lévesque O.
Montréal, QC H2Z 1A4 / CA
For all designated states
Fraunhofer Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27 c
80686 München / DE
For all designated states
Consorzio Interuniversitario Nazionale per la Scienza e Tecnologia dei Materiali (INSTM)
Via G. Giusti 9
50121 Firenze / IT
For all designated states
Università degli Studi di Milano - Bicocca
Piazza dell'Ateneo Nuovo, 1
20126 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / POSSET, Uwe
Egersdorfer Strasse 21
90556 Cadolzburg / DE
02 / HERBIG, Bettina
Offentalstrasse 10
97250 Erlabrunn / DE
03 / SCHOTTNER, Gerhard
Raitersaicher Weg 6
91560 Heilsbronn / DE
04 / ZAGHIB, Karim
3672 Belcourt
Longueuil, Québec J4M 2M7 / CA
05 / LABRECQUE, Jean-François
4361 de Bordeaux
Montreal H2H 1Z6 / CA
06 / GUERFI, Abdelbast
8655 boulevard Rivard
Brossard, Québec J4X 1W2 / CA
07 / PERRIER, Michel
6323 28è Avenue
Montreal, Québec H1T 3H8 / CA
08 / RUFFO, Riccardo
Via Alessandro Volta, 1
20091 Bresso / IT
09 / SALAMONE, Matteo Marco
Via Angelo Cazzaniga, 161
20861 Brugherio / IT
10 / MARI, Claudio Maria
Via Marco d'Oggiono 1
20123 Milan / IT
11 / BEVERINA, Luca
Via G. Murat, 72
20159 Milan / IT
12 / PAGANI, Giorgio
Via Tarvisio
20125 Milan / IT
13 / DONTIGNY, Martin
3451 des Dahlias
Notre-Dame-Du-Mont-Carmel Québec G0X 3J0 / CA
 [2014/31]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/31]Bublak, Wolfgang
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12759740.919.09.2012
WO2012EP68434
Priority number, dateEP2011018174919.09.2011         Original published format: EP 11181749
[2014/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013041562
Date:28.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2758832
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/153, G02F1/155
[2014/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/31]
TitleGerman:BIEGSAME UND TRANSPARENTE ELEKTROCHROME VORRICHTUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2014/31]
English:FLEXIBLE TRANSPARENT ELECTROCHOMIC DEVICE, AND A METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF[2014/31]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROCHROMATIQUE TRANSPARENT FLEXIBLE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION[2014/31]
Entry into regional phase14.03.2014National basic fee paid 
14.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/31]
06.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.07.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
21.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
19.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[YD]WO2008064878  (FRAUNHOFER GES ZUER FOERDERUNG [DE]; UNIV MILANO BICOCCA [IT]; CELIK A) [YD] 1-13,16-18 * the whole document *;
 [YD]WO2009098415  (HYDRO QUEBEC [CA]; ESSILOR INT [FR]; ZAGHIB KARIM [CA]; FEUILLADE MATH) [YD] 1-13,16-18 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2002012848  (CALLAHAN ROBERT W [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-13,16-18 * abstract *;
 [Y]  - MARCILLA R ET AL, "Tailor-made polymer electrolytes based upon ionic liquids and their application in all-plastic electrochromic devices", ELECTROCHEMISTRY COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 8, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.ELECOM.2006.01.013, ISSN 1388-2481, (20060301), pages 482 - 488, (20060301), XP028041466 [Y] 1-13,16-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.elecom.2006.01.013
by applicantWO2008064878
 WO2009098415
 WO2006087950
    - A. J. WIDJAJA ET AL., SOLAR ENERGY MATERIALS & SOLAR CELLS, (2008), vol. 92, pages 97 - 100
    - M. KURIHARA ET AL., NANOTECHNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 18, page 345609