Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2742409

EP2742409 - METHOD OF CHARACTERIZING TOUCH ON A TACTILE SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.06.2018  [2018/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nissha Printing Co., Ltd.
3, Mibu Hanai-cho
Nakagyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8551 / JP
[2017/19]
Former [2014/25]For all designated states
Stantum
107 Cours Balguerie Stuttenberg
33000 Bordeaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / RIES, Gowri
19 rue Chanzy
F-33700 Merignac / FR
02 / FICHOUX, Marianne
63 rue des Carmes
F-33000 Bordeaux / FR
03 / OLIVIER, Julien
12 rue Brascassat
F-33800 Bordeaux / FR
04 / JOGUET, Pascal
17 Lotissement Piron
F-33670 Sadirac / FR
05 / LARGILLIER, Guillaume
Lot 6
175 rue de la Benauge
F-33100 Bordeaux / FR
 [2014/25]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/34]Santarelli
49, avenue des Champs Elysées
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2014/25]Khatab, Abdelaziz
Santarelli
14, avenue de la Grande Armée
B.P. 237
75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date12761644.906.08.2012
WO2012FR51849
Priority number, dateFR2011005733612.08.2011         Original published format: FR 1157336
[2014/25]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013024225
Date:21.02.2013
Language:FR
[2013/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2742409
Date:18.06.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2013
[2014/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/041, G06F3/048, G06F3/044
[2014/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/25]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR KENNZEICHNUNG EINER BERÜHRUNG AUF EINEM TAKTILEN DISPLAY[2014/25]
English:METHOD OF CHARACTERIZING TOUCH ON A TACTILE SCREEN[2014/25]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CARACTÉRISATION DE TOUCHER SUR UN ÉCRAN TACTILE[2014/25]
Entry into regional phase03.03.2014National basic fee paid 
03.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/25]
12.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/25]
13.02.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/25]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Stay/Interruption22.04.2015Interruption of proceedings, reason: legal prevention of applicant[2015/26]
03.04.2017Resumption of proceedings[2017/07]
22.04.2015Interruption of proceedings, reason: legal prevention of applicant[2017/07]
Cited inInternational search[X]US2007152976  (TOWNSEND REED L [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0070]; figures 5-13 *;
 [X]US2008158185  (WESTERMAN WAYNE CARL [US]) [X] 1-25 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1,2,11 *;
 [X]US2011074701  (DICKINSON TIMOTHY [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9,11,15,20-25 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1,6,7 *;
 [X]US2002080123  (KENNEDY PETER J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11,20-25 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0048]; figures 2,3 *
by applicantEP1717677
 EP2159670
 US2009095540
 EP1719047