blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2755984 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2755984



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2387
04.09.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.09.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.09.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.09.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 213
04.09.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 213
30.08.2019 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 3
30.08.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
18.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 228
18.07.2019 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 2
10.07.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.07.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
10.07.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
10.07.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 213
10.07.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 213
01.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.03.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 187
01.03.2019 Description Search / examination 184
01.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.03.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.12.2018 General authorisation Search / examination 1
06.12.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
02.11.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
02.11.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.10.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
27.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.09.2018 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 10
27.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.09.2018 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
28.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 16
28.09.2017 Claims Search / examination 16
28.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.09.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.07.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
13.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.07.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.03.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
31.03.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.02.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.11.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 16
12.11.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 26
12.11.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
12.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.11.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
25.06.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.05.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
22.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.04.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
25.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.03.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
24.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
09.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 186
09.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 155
21.03.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
21.03.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 207
13.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
13.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
13.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
24.09.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
24.09.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 26
24.09.2012 Description International Searching Authority 167
24.09.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 13