blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2755984


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.07.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.03.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
12.11.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.11.2018 Change - applicant published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
01.10.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.09.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
29.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.07.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.04.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.03.2017 First examination report
30.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.11.2014 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
29.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.11.2014 Amendment by applicant
14.11.2014 Change - extension states published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
05.11.2014 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
20.06.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
20.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
25.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
28.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
22.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.2012 PCT data prior to European publication