blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2755984 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280056158 EP12761867



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019127790Global Dossier 02.05.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201715602400 23.05.2017
US201161627211 07.10.2011
US201213615284 13.09.2012
US201161534347 13.09.2011
US201816020190 27.06.2018
US201615188283 21.06.2016
US201414504093 01.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10041115Global Dossier 07.08.2018B2
US2017327886 16.11.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201715602400 23.05.2017
US201161627211 07.10.2011
US201213615284 13.09.2012
US201161534347 13.09.2011
US201615188283 21.06.2016
US201414504093 01.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9689035Global Dossier 27.06.2017B2
US2016369336 22.12.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201161627211 07.10.2011
US201213615284 13.09.2012
US201161534347 13.09.2011
US201615188283 21.06.2016
US201414504093 01.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9399798Global Dossier 26.07.2016B2
US2015176074 25.06.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201161627211 07.10.2011
US201213615284 13.09.2012
US201161534347 13.09.2011
US201414504093 01.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8889860Global Dossier 18.11.2014B2
US2013122489 16.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161627211 07.10.2011
US201213615284 13.09.2012
US201161534347 13.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20140067113Global Dossier 03.06.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161627211 07.10.2011
US201161534347 13.09.2011
WO2012US55231 13.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6196972BGlobal Dossier 13.09.2017B2
JP2014532043 04.12.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161627211 07.10.2011
US201161534347 13.09.2011
WO2012US55231 13.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104024269BGlobal Dossier 24.05.2017B
CN104024269 03.09.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161627211 07.10.2011
US201161534347 13.09.2011
WO2012US55231 13.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2755984Global Dossier 23.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201161627211 07.10.2011
US201161534347 13.09.2011
WO2012US55231 13.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2012308518B 17.08.2017B2
AU2012308518 27.03.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201161627211 07.10.2011
US201161534347 13.09.2011
WO2012US55231 13.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2848049 21.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161627211 07.10.2011
US201161534347 13.09.2011
WO2012US55231 13.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1200838 14.08.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201161627211 07.10.2011
US201161534347 13.09.2011
WO2012US55231 13.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL231460 31.05.2018A
IL231460D 30.04.2014D0
Priority number Date
US201161627211 07.10.2011
US201161534347 13.09.2011
WO2012US55231 13.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX342195 20.09.2016B
MX2014003075 25.11.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161627211 07.10.2011
US201161534347 13.09.2011
WO2012US55231 13.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ622268 29.04.2016A
Priority number Date
US201161627211 07.10.2011
US201161534347 13.09.2011
WO2012US55231 13.09.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013040257Global Dossier 21.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161627211 07.10.2011
US201161534347 13.09.2011