Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2755984

EP2755984 - 5-METHOXY. 3'-OH UNBLOCKED, FAST PHOTOCLEAVABLE TERMINATING NUCLEOTIDES AND METHODS FOR NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.03.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agilent Technologies, Inc.
5301 Stevens Creek Blvd.
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
[2018/49]
Former [2014/30]For all designated states
Lasergen, Inc.
8052 El Rio Street
Houston TX 77054 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STUPI, Brian, Philip
19814 Indian Cherry Forest Lane
Cypress, TX 77433 / US
02 / LI, Hong
4714 N. Ardmore Avenue
Milwaukee, WI 53211 / US
03 / WU, Weidong
5518 Jackwood Street
Houston, TX 77096 / US
04 / HERSH, Megan, N.
230 N. Pemberton Circle Drive
Houston, TX 77025 / US
05 / HERTZOG, David
1723 Milford Street
Houston, TX 77098 / US
06 / MORRIS, Sidney, E.
10146 North West Park Drive
Houston, TX 77086 / US
07 / METZKER, Michael, L.
1511 Mcduffie Street
Houston, TX 77019 / US
 [2014/30]
Representative(s)Rückerl, Florian
Dehmel & Bettenhausen
Patentanwälte PartmbB
Herzogspitalstraße 11
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/30]Rückerl, Florian
Dehmel und Bettenhausen
Herzogspitalstraße 11
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date12761867.613.09.2012
WO2012US55231
Priority number, dateUS201161534347P13.09.2011         Original published format: US 201161534347 P
US201161627211P07.10.2011         Original published format: US 201161627211 P
[2014/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013040257
Date:21.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2755984
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013
[2014/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07H19/073, C07H19/10, C07H19/20, C07H19/173
[2014/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/30]
TitleGerman:5-METHOXY. 3 '-OH-UNBLOCKIERTE, SCHNELL PHOTOSPALTBARE ENDGRUPPENNUKLEOTIDE UND VERFAHREN ZUR NUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZIERUNG[2014/30]
English:5-METHOXY. 3'-OH UNBLOCKED, FAST PHOTOCLEAVABLE TERMINATING NUCLEOTIDES AND METHODS FOR NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCING[2014/30]
French:5-MÉTHOXY-NUCLÉOTIDES À TERMINAISON RAPIDEMENT PHOTOCLIVABLE NON BLOQUÉS EN 3'OH ET PROCÉDÉS DE SÉQUENÇAGE D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE[2014/30]
Entry into regional phase25.03.2014National basic fee paid 
25.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/30]
12.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201403   M06   Fee paid on   26.11.2014
Cited inInternational search[I]US2010041041  (LITOSH VLADISLAV A [US], et al) [I] 1-115 * paragraphs [0196] , [0197] * * paragraph [0312] - paragraph [0332] *
 [XP]  - BRIAN P. STUPI ET AL, "Stereochemistry of Benzylic Carbon Substitution Coupled with Ring Modification of 2-Nitrobenzyl Groups as Key Determinants for Fast-Cleaving Reversible Terminators", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (20120213), vol. 51, no. 7, doi:10.1002/anie.201106516, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 1724 - 1727, XP055043239 [XP] 1-115 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201106516
 [XDP]  - A. F. GARDNER ET AL, "Rapid incorporation kinetics and improved fidelity of a novel class of 3'-OH unblocked reversible terminators", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20120801), vol. 40, no. 15, doi:10.1093/nar/gks330, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 7404 - 7415, XP055043174 [XDP] 1-115 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gks330
by applicantUS6664079
 US7057026
 US7345159
 US7635578
 US7713698
 US7414116
 US7541444
 US7592435
 US7556537
 US7771973
 US7897737
 US7964352
 US8148503
 US2011287427
 US7476734
 EP0640146
 US2010041041
 US5770367
 US7329492
 US6255083
 US5302509
 US3822996
 US3859045
 US3917499
 US3917449
 US4737155
 US4304568
 US2004110196
 US4631066
 WO2012037394
 US5151507
 US4439356
 US5188934
 US2006160081
    - ALIOTTA ET AL., GENET ANAL. BIOMOL ENG., (1996), vol. 12, pages 185 - 95
    - AXELROD, METHODS CELL BIOL., (1989), vol. 30, pages 245 - 70
    - BAILEY, Ozonation in organic chemistry, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., (1978), vol. 1
    - BAILEY, Ozonation in organic chemistry, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., (1982), vol. 2
    - BARLTROP ET AL., CHEM. COMMUN., (1966), pages 822 - 23
    - BARONE ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES, NUCLEOTIDES, AND NUCLEIC ACIDS, (2001), vol. 20, pages 1141 - 45
    - BARTH ET AL., J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1997), vol. 119, pages 4149 - 59
    - BEADLING ET AL., J. MOL. DIAGN., (2012), vol. 13, pages 504 - 13
    - BENTLEY ET AL., NATURE, (2008), vol. 456, pages 53 - 59
    - BERSON; BROWN, J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1955), vol. 77, pages 447 - 50
    - BHALLA, TOXICOLOGY LETTERS, (1994), vol. 73, pages 91 - 101
    - BOWERS ET AL., NATURE METHODS, (2009), vol. 6, pages 593 - 95
    - CAMERON; FRECHET, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1991), vol. 113, pages 4303 - 13
    - CANARD; SARFATI, GENE, (1994), vol. 148, pages 1 - 6
    - CARRASCO; VÁZQUEZ, MED. RES. REV., (1984), vol. 4, pages 471 - 512
    - CLELAND, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1964), vol. 3, pages 480 - 82
    - CORRIE ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS., (1992), vol. 1, pages 1015 - 19
    - CORRIE, Dynamics studies in biology, WILEY-VCH VERLAG GMBH & CO. KGAA, (2005), pages 1 - 28
    - CRABTREE; KEMP, INDUS. ENG. CHEM., (1946), vol. 38, pages 278 - 296
    - DE MAYO ET AL., ADVANCES IN ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1960), vol. 2, pages 367 - 425
    - DRESSMAN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2003), vol. 100, pages 8817 - 8822
    - EID ET AL., SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 323, pages 133 - 13 8
    - FAIRCHILD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1959), vol. 130, pages 861 - 862
    - FARE ET AL., ANAL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 75, pages 4672 - 4675
    - FUTREAL ET AL., NATURE REV. CANCER, (2004), vol. 4, pages 177 - 83
    - GARDNER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1999), vol. 27, pages 2545 - 53
    - GARDNER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2012), vol. 40, pages 7404 - 15
    - GERSHON, NATURE METHODS, (2004), vol. 1, pages 263 - 270
    - GIEGRICH ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES NUCLEOTIDES, (1998), vol. 17, pages 1987 - 1996
    - GIVENS; SCHOWEN, Chemiluminescence and Photochemical Reaction Detection in Chromatography, VCH, (1989), pages 125 - 47
    - GOMMERS-AMPT ET AL., FASEB J., (1995), vol. 9, pages 1034 - 42
    - GREGORY, Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, (2009), pages 1 - 66
    - GUO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2008), vol. 105, pages 9145 - 50
    - HARDWICK ET AL., TRANS. FARAD. SOC., (1960), vol. 56, pages 44 - 50
    - HARRIS ET AL., SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 320, pages 106 - 109
    - HASAN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1997), vol. 53, pages 4247 - 64
    - HASTINGS, J. MOL. EVOL., (1983), vol. 19, pages 309 - 21
    - HEWITT ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 344, pages 56 - 58
    - HSIA ET AL., CURRENT OPINION IN STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (2005), vol. 15, pages 126 - 134
    - IAFRATE ET AL., NATURE GENET., (2004), vol. 36, pages 949 - 51
    - ITO ET AL., NATURE, (2010), vol. 466, pages 1129 - 33
    - JU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2006), vol. 103, pages 19635 - 40
    - KAISER ET AL., J. BIOL CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 21387 - 394
    - KRIAUCIONIS; HEINTZ, SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 324, pages 929 - 30
    - LEHNINGER, Principles of Biochemistry, W.H. FREEMAN AND CO., (2005), pages 273 - 305
    - LEVY ET AL., PLOS BIOL, (2007), vol. 5, page E254
    - LIMBACH ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 2183 - 2196
    - LITOSH ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., vol. 39, page E39
    - LYAMICHEV ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 17, pages 292 - 296
    - MARGULIES ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 437, pages 376 - 80
    - MCCRAY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 7237 - 41
    - MCDOUGALL ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES, NUCLEOTIDES & NUCLEIC ACIDS, (2001), vol. 20, pages 501 - 6
    - MCGALL ET AL., J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1997), vol. 119, pages 5081 - 90
    - MELDRUM ET AL., CLIN. BIOCHEM. REV., (2011), vol. 32, pages 177 - 95
    - METZKER ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1998), vol. 25, pages 446 - 462
    - METZKER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 4259 - 67
    - METZKER, GENOME RES., (2005), vol. 15, pages 1767 - 76
    - METZKER, NATURE REV. GENET., (2010), vol. 11, pages 31 - 46
    - MITRA ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (2003), vol. 320, pages 55 - 65
    - MORRISON, The chemistry of nitro and nitroso groups, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1969), pages 165 - 213
    - MOSHER ET AL., J. CHEM. PHYS., (1960), vol. 32, pages 1888 - 89
    - MOYER ET AL., LASER FOCUS WORLD, (1993), vol. 29, no. 10
    - NIEMAN, Chemiluminescence and Photochemical Reaction Detection in Chromatography, VCH, (1989), pages 99 - 123
    - OROSZ ET AL., CRIT. REV. ANAL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 26, pages 1 - 27
    - PATCHORNIK ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1970), vol. 92, pages 6333 - 35
    - PATCHOMIK ET AL., Pharmacology of hormonal polypeptides and proteins, PLENUM PRESS, (1968), pages 11 - 16
    - RAMANATHAN ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (2004), vol. 330, pages 227 - 241
    - REDON ET AL., NATURE, (2006), vol. 444, pages 444 - 454
    - REICHMANIS ET AL., J. POLYMER SCI., (1985), vol. 23, pages 1 - 8
    - ROCKHILL ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1997), vol. 118, pages 10065 - 68
    - RONAGHI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 281, pages 363 - 365
    - SALVIN; WALKER, TEXTILE RESEARCH JOURNAL, (1955), vol. 25, pages 571 - 581
    - SEBAT ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 305, pages 525 - 528
    - SEELA; PENG ET AL., Current Protocols in Nucleic Acid Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (2005), vol. 1, page 10.1
    - SEO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U S A, (2005), vol. 102, pages 5926 - 5931
    - SERVICE, SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 282, pages 1020 - 1021
    - SMITH; HO, J. ORG. CHEM., (1990), vol. 55, page 2543
    - SOENGAS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 253, pages 517 - 29
    - SOUSA; WEINSTEIN, J. ORG. CHEM., (1962), vol. 27, pages 3155 - 59
    - STAUDINER; MEYER, HELV. CHIM. ACTA, (1919), vol. 2, page 635
    - STRANGER ET AL., SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 315, pages 848 - 853
    - STUPI ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2012), vol. 51, pages 1724 - 1727
    - SU ET AL., J. MOL DIAGN., (2011), vol. 13, pages 74 - 84
    - TAHILIANI ET AL., SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 324, pages 930 - 35
    - TURCATTI ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2008), vol. 36, page E25
    - TUZUN ET AL., NATURE GENET., (2005), vol. 37, pages 727 - 32
    - WALKER ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1986), vol. 25, pages 1799 - 1805
    - WEINSTEIN ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1966), vol. 31, pages 1983 - 1985
    - WETTERMARK, NATURE, (1962), vol. 194, page 677
    - WOOTTON; TRENTHAM, Photochemical probes in biochemistry (NATO Science Series C, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (1989), vol. 272, pages 277 - 296
    - WU ET AL., NATURE GENET., (2012), vol. 44, pages 251 - 253
    - WU ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2007), vol. 35, pages 6339 - 6349
    - WYATT; COHEN, BIOCHEM. J., (1953), vol. 55, pages 774 - 782
 EP19870310256
 WO1990US05565