blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2755896


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
30.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
23.09.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.10.2016  [2016/43]
26.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.09.2016  [2016/39]
19.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.09.2016  [2016/38]
12.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.09.2016  [2016/37]
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
22.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.08.2016  [2016/34]
20.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
13.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2016  [2016/24]
06.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2016  [2016/23]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
22.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
15.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
16.10.2015 (Expected) grant published on  18.11.2015  [2015/47]
12.10.2015 Change - representative
02.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.08.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
14.08.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.08.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.04.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.11.2014 Amendment by applicant
21.11.2014 Change - extension states published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
07.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.06.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
20.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
22.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
29.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
22.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
02.10.2012 PCT data prior to European publication