blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2755896
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2755896Global Dossier 18.11.2015B1
EP2755896 23.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE202011105701 15.09.2011
WO2012EP68057 14.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2562352T 03.03.2016T3
Priority number Date
DE202011105701 15.09.2011
WO2012EP68057 14.09.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013037936Global Dossier 21.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
DE202011105701 15.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE202011105701U 16.12.2011U1
Priority number Date
DE202011105701 15.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI492892B 21.07.2015B
TW201323292 16.06.2013A
Priority number Date
DE202011105701 15.09.2011