Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2755896

EP2755896 - TWIN PACKAGE CARTON [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.09.2016
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reemtsma Cigarettenfabriken GmbH
Max-Born-Straße 4
22761 Hamburg / DE
[2015/47]
Former [2014/30]For all designated states
Reemtsma Cigarettenfabriken GmbH
Max-Born-Straße 4
22761 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / DREWS, Christian
Max-Born-Strasse 4
22761 Hamburg / DE
 [2014/30]
Representative(s)Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[2015/47]
Former [2014/30]Prinz & Partner
Esplanade 31
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date12761942.714.09.2012
[2015/47]
WO2012EP68057
Priority number, dateDE201120105701U15.09.2011         Original published format: DE 202011105701 U
[2014/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013037936
Date:21.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2755896
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013
[2014/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2755896
Date:18.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:B65D5/42, B65D85/10
[2014/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DOPPELVERPACKUNGSKARTON[2014/30]
English:TWIN PACKAGE CARTON[2014/30]
French:CARTON D'EMBALLAGE DOUBLE[2014/30]
Entry into regional phase15.04.2014National basic fee paid 
15.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/30]
19.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2015Fee for grant paid
10.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.04.2015
Opposition(s)19.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.09.2012
AL18.11.2015
AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
BG18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU14.09.2012
AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
BG18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2018/31]HU14.09.2012
AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU14.09.2012
AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2017/31]AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/39]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/38]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/36]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/34]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/25]AT18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/23]HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
Former [2016/22]IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
Former [2016/21]IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
Former [2016/20]LT18.11.2015
Cited inInternational search[YD]WO2004016522  (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH], et al) [YD] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE8714972U  (BIND-O-MATIC AB) [Y] 1-13,16,17 * page 4, paragraphs 2-3 * * page 6, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-4; claims 1,6-8 *;
 [Y]DE2626602  (GIERSIEPEN ELTECH IND) [Y] 14,15 * page 5, paragraphs 2-3 * * page 7, paragraph 4; figure - *
by applicantEP0122524
 EP0537951
 WO03089314
 GB453296
 US5251748
 WO2004016522