blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2758161 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2758161



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 240
11.06.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
03.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.06.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.03.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
13.03.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.11.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
19.04.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.04.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
18.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
18.05.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
18.05.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
18.05.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
18.05.2017 Description Search / examination 2
18.05.2017 Description Search / examination 2
18.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.05.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
20.03.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
15.03.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
17.11.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.04.2016 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.04.2016 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
18.02.2015 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
12.02.2015 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
30.01.2015 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
11.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.12.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
11.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.12.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
11.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.11.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 5
05.11.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 5
02.09.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
18.08.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
11.08.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
02.07.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.06.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
28.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.04.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
09.04.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
10.03.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
05.03.2014 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 11
04.03.2014 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 11
31.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
10.05.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
10.05.2013 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
15.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
28.03.2013 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 27
12.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
12.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
12.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 6
18.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
18.09.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
18.09.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
18.09.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 18
18.09.2012 Drawings PCT receiving Office 5