blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2758161


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.06.2019 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.03.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.09.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.04.2018 Change - representative
29.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.05.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.03.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.11.2016 First examination report
26.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.12.2014 Amendment by applicant
28.11.2014 Change - extension states published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
02.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.09.2014 Change - inventor published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
27.06.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.07.2014  [2014/31]
27.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  30.07.2014  [2014/31]
23.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
09.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
03.10.2012 PCT data prior to European publication