blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2758161 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280045724 EP12762264



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9504978Global Dossier 29.11.2016B2
US2015038745 05.02.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2012EP68324 18.09.2012
DE102011114228 23.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103813852Global Dossier 21.05.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012EP68324 18.09.2012
DE102011114228 23.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2758161Global Dossier 30.07.2014A2
Priority number Date
WO2012EP68324 18.09.2012
DE102011114228 23.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013041516Global Dossier 10.05.2013A3
WO2013041516 28.03.2013A2
Priority number Date
DE102011114228 23.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102011114228 28.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
DE102011114228 23.09.2011